This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/30/2020 at 17:56:16 (UTC).

SAVOIE, CHRISTINA MICHELLE vs SAVOIE, ALLEN BRADY

Case Summary

On 10/30/2018 SAVOIE, CHRISTINA MICHELLE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SAVOIE, ALLEN BRADY. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RODRIGUEZ, HEATHER PINDER and MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 DC

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RODRIGUEZ, HEATHER PINDER

MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SAVOIE, CHRISTINA MICHELLE

Respondent

SAVOIE, ALLEN BRADY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CRANTON, GEORGE D ESQ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR REQUEST OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO HONORABLE JUDGE HEATHER PINDER RODRIGUEZ (COPY PLACED IN JUDGE'S BIN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR CIVIL CONTEMPT/ENFORCEMENT (COPY PLACED IN JUDGE'S BIN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: RESPONDENT/FORMER HUSBAND'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE PETITIONER/FORMER WIFE'S SUPLLEMENTAL PETITION FOR MODIFICATION OF FINAL JUDGEMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (COPY PLACED IN JUDGE'S BIN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $2.00 RECEIPT #2020062248

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketEntry: CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR ALLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $60.00 RECEIPT #2020058741

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketEntry: UPDATED FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (SHORT FORM) FOR CHRISTINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketEntry: UPDATED UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketEntry: SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FOR MODIFICATION OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER FOR CHRISTINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT WITH PARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: VITAL STATISTICS FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 10/30/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018 DR 004591 DC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRANTON, GEORGE D ESQ