This case was last updated from Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County on 01/10/2021 at 16:28:00 (UTC).

SANTIAGO, ALEXIS vs. ABC LANDCLEARING AND DEVELOPMENT LLC

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 SANTIAGO, ALEXIS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ABC LANDCLEARING AND DEVELOPMENT LLC. This case was filed in Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MURPHY, MICHAEL and EGAN, ROBERT J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 AN

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Osceola County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MURPHY, MICHAEL

EGAN, ROBERT J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANTIAGO, ALEXIS

Defendants

ABC LANDCLEARING AND DEVELOPMENT LLC

WIMES, GEORGE WILLIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROMERO, MARIO ESQ

Defendant Attorney

BERNARD, SOPHIA

 

Court Documents

UNIFORM ORDER SETTING CASE FOR JURY TRIAL; PRE-TRIAL CONFERNECE & REQUIRING PRETRIAL MATTERS TO BE COMPLETED

12/16/2020: UNIFORM ORDER SETTING CASE FOR JURY TRIAL; PRE-TRIAL CONFERNECE & REQUIRING PRETRIAL MATTERS TO BE COMPLETED

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES

11/18/2020: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES

DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

10/23/2020: DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

8/28/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

DEFENDANT RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF REQUEST TO PRODUCE

7/17/2020: DEFENDANT RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF REQUEST TO PRODUCE

DEFENDANT ABC LANDCLEARING & DEVELOPMENT LLC NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF INTERROGATORIES

7/17/2020: DEFENDANT ABC LANDCLEARING & DEVELOPMENT LLC NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF INTERROGATORIES

DEFENDANT GEORGE WILLIE WIMES NOTICE OF SERVING UNVERIFIED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF INTERROGATORIES

7/16/2020: DEFENDANT GEORGE WILLIE WIMES NOTICE OF SERVING UNVERIFIED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF INTERROGATORIES

PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWER TO 1ST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

6/8/2020: PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWER TO 1ST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

5/19/2020: PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

4/13/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

4/13/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED ON 2/19/20 FOR GEORGE WILLIE WIMES

4/10/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED ON 2/19/20 FOR GEORGE WILLIE WIMES

DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF SERVICE OF MEDICARE/MEDICAID INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

3/17/2020: DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF SERVICE OF MEDICARE/MEDICAID INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

3/12/2020: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

3/9/2020: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

2/12/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

2/10/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/10/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2021
  • HearingEvent: STATUS HEARING; Judge: MURPHY, MICHAEL; Location: COURTROOM 5C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF WITNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: UNIFORM ORDER SETTING CASE FOR JURY TRIAL; PRE-TRIAL CONFERNECE & REQUIRING PRETRIAL MATTERS TO BE COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF WITNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF WITNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: STATUS HEARING SET FOR 01/27/2021 AT 9:04 AM IN 5C BEFORE JUDGE: MURPHY, MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: LINE DOCKETED IN ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER SETTING STATUS HEARING* TO DETERMINE DATE OF TRIALAND/OR NEED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2020015759

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 02/11/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CA 000395 AN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • HearingEvent: STATUS HEARING; Judge: MURPHY, MICHAEL; Location: COURTROOM 5C; Result: SET IN ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABC LANDCLEARING DEVELOPMENT INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROMERO, MARIO ESQ