This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 01/13/2021 at 10:51:01 (UTC).

ROMAN VAZQUEZ, NELSON vs RAMIREZ TORUNO, MARGERLA

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 ROMAN VAZQUEZ, NELSON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RAMIREZ TORUNO, MARGERLA. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 DS

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROMAN VAZQUEZ, NELSON

Respondent

RAMIREZ TORUNO, MARGERLA

Not Yet Classified

CARMONA, OMAR ESQ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CARMONA, OMAR ESQ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONCLUSION OF REPRESENTATION (EMAILED FAMILY INTAKE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF FINAL JUDGEMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE - RECORDED (OR.5844.539. / 2020164269)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Judge: MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III; Location: COURTROOM 5D; Result: HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketEntry: COURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $10.50 RECEIPT #2020065473

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketEntry: COPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE FOR NELSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketEntry: MOTION HEARING SET FOR 09/09/2020 AT 10:30 AM IN 5D BEFORE JUDGE: MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketEntry: FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (SHORT FORM) FOR NELSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER FOR NELSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH PROPERTY BUT NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketEntry: COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 07/01/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 DR 002106 DS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARMONA, OMAR ESQ