This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 01/08/2021 at 07:22:45 (UTC).

RHODY, KEVIN vs. VEECO INSTRUMENTS INC

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 RHODY, KEVIN filed an Other lawsuit against VEECO INSTRUMENTS INC. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 AP

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

 

Party Details

Appellant

RHODY, KEVIN

Appellee

VEECO INSTRUMENTS INC

 

Court Documents

ANSWER BRIEF OF VEECO INSTRUMENTS

3/24/2020: ANSWER BRIEF OF VEECO INSTRUMENTS

RECORD ON APPEAL COMPLETED

12/2/2019: RECORD ON APPEAL COMPLETED

INDEX TO RECORD ON APPEAL

10/11/2019: INDEX TO RECORD ON APPEAL

ACKNOWLDEGMENT OF FILING NEW NOTICE OF APPEAL

8/23/2019: ACKNOWLDEGMENT OF FILING NEW NOTICE OF APPEAL

NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED: (2018CC1677)

8/21/2019: NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED: (2018CC1677)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketEntry: E-MAIL CORRESPONDENCE/CONFIRAMTION OF TRANSFERRED COUNTY APPEAL BEING SENT TO 5DCA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketEntry: APPEAL TRANSFER FORM AND DOCKET PROGRESS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketEntry: E-MAIL CORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEAL-TRANSFERRED TO 5DCA DUE TO ORDER FROM CHIEF JUDGE WITH APPEAL TRANSFER FORM AND DOCKET SHEET 2019_AP_22_AP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER BRIEF OF VEECO INSTRUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE ANSWER BREIF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER DENYING APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketEntry: APPELLANT'S RESPONSE TO APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: RECORD ON APPEAL COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketEntry: APELLANT'S INITIAL BREIF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: INDEX TO RECORD ON APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPERANCE AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLEE AND DESIGNATION OF E MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ACKNOWLDEGMENT OF FILING NEW NOTICE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 08/23/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019 AP 000022 AP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED: (2018CC1677)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Veeco Instruments, Inc. is a litigant