This case was last updated from Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/02/2022 at 17:10:01 (UTC).

QUIROZ, ANDREWS CLAYTON vs. GREEN, JUSTIN WAYNE

Case Summary

On 06/03/2022 QUIROZ, ANDREWS CLAYTON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GREEN, JUSTIN WAYNE. This case was filed in Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHREIBER, MARGARET H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 AN

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHREIBER, MARGARET H

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

QUIROZ, ANDREWS CLAYTON

RODRIGUEZ MORONTA, CARLOS ALBERTO

Defendants

GREEN, JUSTIN WAYNE

THE HERTZ CORPORATION

HERTZ VEHICLES LLC

GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TISON, DEVIN P ESQ

Defendant Attorney

ELLIS, KATHERINE ESQ

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

6/3/2022: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

6/15/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF ANDRES CLAYTON QUIROZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT NOTICE OF SERVNG INTERROGATORIES TO PLAITNIFF ANDRES CLAYTON QUIROZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT GOVERNMENT EMPLOYUEES INSURANCE COMPANY REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF ANDRES CLAYTON QUIROZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF SERVICE EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT GOVERNMENT ECMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 7/5/2022 PARTY SERVED: THE HERTZ CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICEOF PROCESS FOR GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY WHO WAS SERVED ON 7/6/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $450.00 RECEIPT #2022051938

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2022
  • DocketEntry: E-MAIL CORRESPONDENCE (MISSING CMO)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 06/03/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CA 001428 AN

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HERTZ VEHICLES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where The Hertz Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Government Employees Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY is a litigant