This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 20:28:46 (UTC).

QUALITY COUNTS AUTO GLASS LLC AAO vs. ARTISAN AND TRUCKERS CASUALTY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/21/2017 QUALITY COUNTS AUTO GLASS LLC AAO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ARTISAN AND TRUCKERS CASUALTY COMPANY. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE and EPPERSON, HAL C JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 SP

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE

EPPERSON, HAL C JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUALITY COUNTS AUTO GLASS LLC AAO

Defendants

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

ARTISAN AND TRUCKERS CASUALTY COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARROWS, KRISTY L ESQ

Defendant Attorney

RADER, DAVID

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

8/10/2019: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

11/20/2017: DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/20/2017: DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

11/1/2017: DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT (LIMITED TO THE ISSUE OF APPRAISAL)

10/19/2017: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT (LIMITED TO THE ISSUE OF APPRAISAL)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/19/2017: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

JOINT STIPULATION INVOKING THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (AT PRE-TRIAL/ MEDIATION) / (10/20/17) ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION

10/13/2017: JOINT STIPULATION INVOKING THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (AT PRE-TRIAL/ MEDIATION) / (10/20/17) ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

10/12/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2017083163

8/23/2017: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2017083163

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM & CHANGE IN SERVICE DESIGNATION EMAIL, ADDRESS, PHONE AND FAX NUMBER

5/15/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM & CHANGE IN SERVICE DESIGNATION EMAIL, ADDRESS, PHONE AND FAX NUMBER

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS DUCES TECUM (RELATED TO APPRAISAL)

10/19/2017: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS DUCES TECUM (RELATED TO APPRAISAL)

NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS (PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE CO.)

9/29/2017: NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS (PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE CO.)

NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS (PROGESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE CO.)

9/29/2017: NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS (PROGESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE CO.)

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

8/22/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

8/21/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

8/21/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

8/21/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

$ 1240.72 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

8/21/2017: $ 1240.72 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM & CHANGE IN SERVICE DESIGNATION EMAIL, ADDRESS, PHONE AND FAX NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, OR ALTERNATIVELY MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY, COMPEL APPRAISAL AND STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FOR ATTORNEY FEES TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: EXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFIED POLICY

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS (PROGESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE CO.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2017083163

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • DocketEntry: SMALL CLAIMS ATTORNEY PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION SET FOR 10/13/2017 AT 8:29 AM IN 1400 BEFORE JUDGE: EPPERSON, HAL C JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketEntry: LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: $ 1240.72 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 08/21/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 SC 003330 SP

    Read MoreRead Less