This case was last updated from Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/26/2022 at 17:12:59 (UTC).

PULTE HOME COMPANY LLC vs. PROMENADES TWO AT BELLA TRAE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

Case Summary

On 05/27/2022 PULTE HOME COMPANY LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against PROMENADES TWO AT BELLA TRAE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC. This case was filed in Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHREIBER, MARGARET H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 OC

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHREIBER, MARGARET H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PULTE HOME COMPANY LLC

Defendants

PROMENADES TWO AT BELLA TRAE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

ALLIANCE PAVERS, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DEWITT CUSTOM CONCRETE, INC.

FRED GEORGE CONCRETE CORPORATION, A FLORIDA CORPORATION

K&B DRYWALL AND PAINTING SERVICES, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

LEVELTECH, INC., A FLORIDA CORPORATION

MAXIMUM AIR CONDITIONING SERVICES, INC., A FLORIDA CORPORATION

MORENO & MORENO, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ODC CONSTRUCTION, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

PETERSENDEAN ROOFING AND SOLAR SYSTEMS INC., A FLORIDA CORPORATION

ROCKWELL BUILDING SYSTEMS, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SEVAN PLASTERING, INC., A FLORIDA CORPORATION

V.F.S. SERVICES, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

AIG SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

AMERISURE INSURANCE COMPANY

AMERISURE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

BUILDERS INSURANCE GROUP (A MUTUAL CAPTIVE COMPANY)

BURLINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY (THE)

FCCI COMMERICAL INSURANCE COMPANY

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDERSON, AMANDA K

Defendant Attorney

RUSSO, ANDREW

Other Attorneys

RYAN, FAY E.

GOULD, NICOLE D

MCLEAN, PATRICIA A

ROSENGARTEN, YONIT

MESSERSMITH, CANDY LEA

MIELE, JOSEPH R JR

METZGER, JOSEPH T.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

5/27/2022: COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

5/27/2022: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

5/27/2022: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED - AMERISURE

5/27/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED - AMERISURE

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED - AMERISURE

5/27/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED - AMERISURE

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, GUIDEONE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

5/27/2022: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, GUIDEONE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

DEFENDANT NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES

6/22/2022: DEFENDANT NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND ESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT, SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S, WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY, ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED - FCCI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED - AMERISURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED - AMERISURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROCKWELL BUILDING SYSTEMS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLIANCE PAVERS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Builders Insurance Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where LEVELTECH, INC. is a litigant