This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/31/2020 at 12:43:39 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs. WONG, BYRON A

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against WONG, BYRON A. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS, GABRIELLE and SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 CL

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Osceola County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS, GABRIELLE

SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

WONG, BYRON A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAMINSKI, DAVID MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

RUBIN, ARTHUR DREW ESQ

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

5/11/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

DEFENDANT'S OFFER OF JUDGMENT

3/16/2019: DEFENDANT'S OFFER OF JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS

2/28/2019: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS

AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT

2/6/2019: AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT

DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

2/5/2019: DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

2/5/2019: DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SRVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

2/5/2019: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SRVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CONSEL FOR DEFENDANT

2/4/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CONSEL FOR DEFENDANT

SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 1/21/19 PARTY SERVED: BYRON A WONG

1/24/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 1/21/19 PARTY SERVED: BYRON A WONG

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019000724

1/3/2019: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019000724

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

1/2/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

1/2/2019: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/2/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/2/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

1/2/2019: COMPLAINT

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING AND NOTICE OF RELIANCE ON BUSINESS RECORDS CERTIFICATION, PURSUANT TO SECTION 90.803(6) AND 90.902(11), FLORIDA STATUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketEntry: AGREED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S OFFER OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CONSEL FOR DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 1/21/19 PARTY SERVED: BYRON A WONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019000724

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/02/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019 CC 000001 CL

    Read MoreRead Less