This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 10/07/2020 at 15:07:09 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC vs. REYES, LINDEVES

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against REYES, LINDEVES. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 SP

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

REYES, LINDEVES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITE, RAQUEL ANN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

9/25/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

9/25/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2020074901

9/25/2020: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2020074901

PROOF OF DEFENDANT'S ADDRESS

9/22/2020: PROOF OF DEFENDANT'S ADDRESS

$ 2988.74 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

9/22/2020: $ 2988.74 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/22/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2020074901

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/23/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 SC 003799 SP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PROOF OF DEFENDANT'S ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: $ 2988.74 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less