This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/31/2020 at 12:45:01 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs. JOHNSON, JASON

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JOHNSON, JASON. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 SP

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

JOHNSON, JASON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAMINSKI, DAVID MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

12/4/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

12/4/2020: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

12/4/2020: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT / DEFAULT ENTERED ON 12/7/20

12/4/2020: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT / DEFAULT ENTERED ON 12/7/20

PLAINTIFF'S SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE

11/23/2020: PLAINTIFF'S SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE

NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE

10/13/2020: NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

3/28/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

3/28/2019: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

PRE-TRIAL HEARING. DEF. FTA. ATTY TO SUBMIT DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT

2/22/2019: PRE-TRIAL HEARING. DEF. FTA. ATTY TO SUBMIT DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT

SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 1/28/19 PARTY SERVED: MRS.JOHNSON (SPOUSE)

1/31/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 1/28/19 PARTY SERVED: MRS.JOHNSON (SPOUSE)

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2019000715

1/3/2019: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2019000715

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

1/2/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/2/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

1/2/2019: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/2/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

$ 787.31 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

1/2/2019: $ 787.31 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketEntry: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED (OR.5853.1993. / 2020171808)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • HearingEvent: NOTICE TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE PROSECUTION; Judge: SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE; Location: COURTROOM 4B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBIT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT / DEFAULT ENTERED ON 12/7/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: LINE DOCKETED IN ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: LINE DOCKETED IN ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: LINE DOCKETED IN ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: SMALL CLAIMS ATTORNEY PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION SET FOR 02/22/2019 AT 9:00 AM IN 1400 BEFORE JUDGE: SANDERS, GABRIELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: $ 787.31 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/02/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019 SC 000001 SP

    Read MoreRead Less