This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/31/2020 at 12:42:44 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs. FOSTER, RASHAAN

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FOSTER, RASHAAN. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS, GABRIELLE and SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 SP

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS, GABRIELLE

SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

FOSTER, RASHAAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAMINSKI, DAVID MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

5/22/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 1/17/19 PARTY SERVED: RASHAAN FOSTER

1/24/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 1/17/19 PARTY SERVED: RASHAAN FOSTER

STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL

1/18/2019: STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019000748

1/3/2019: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019000748

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

1/2/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/2/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

1/2/2019: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/2/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

$ 3148.70 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

1/2/2019: $ 3148.70 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS ATTORNEY PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION; Judge: SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE; Location: PRE-TRIAL/MEDIATION ROOM 1400; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketEntry: ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL - RECORDED (OR.5485.1970. / 2019027272)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 1/17/19 PARTY SERVED: RASHAAN FOSTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019000748

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: SMALL CLAIMS ATTORNEY PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION SET FOR 03/01/2019 AT 8:00 AM IN 1400 BEFORE JUDGE: SANDERS, GABRIELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: $ 3148.70 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/02/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019 SC 000006 SP

    Read MoreRead Less