This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 11/21/2020 at 17:02:58 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC vs. FINNICAN, COLLEEN

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FINNICAN, COLLEEN. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 SP

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

FINNICAN, COLLEEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITE, RAQUEL ANN

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2020074343

9/23/2020: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2020074343

$ - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

9/22/2020: $ - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

9/22/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/22/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2020074343

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: $ - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PROOF OF DEFENDANT'S ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/22/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 SC 003794 SP

    Read MoreRead Less