This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/31/2020 at 12:46:36 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs. CHAVEZ, ROXANA

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CHAVEZ, ROXANA. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS, GABRIELLE and SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 SP

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS, GABRIELLE

SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

CHAVEZ, ROXANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAMINSKI, DAVID MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILING

5/23/2019: NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILING

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

5/14/2019: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

PRE-TRIAL HEARING. DEF. FTA. ATTY TO SUBMIT DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT

4/5/2019: PRE-TRIAL HEARING. DEF. FTA. ATTY TO SUBMIT DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT

SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED:1/31/19 PARTY SERVED: EDGAR CHAVEZ(CO-RESIDENT)

2/7/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED:1/31/19 PARTY SERVED: EDGAR CHAVEZ(CO-RESIDENT)

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2019001309

1/4/2019: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2019001309

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

1/3/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/3/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

1/2/2019: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/2/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

$ 1713.80 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

1/2/2019: $ 1713.80 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS ATTORNEY PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION; Judge: SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE; Location: PRE-TRIAL/MEDIATION ROOM 1400; Result: DEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PRE-TRIAL HEARING. DEF. FTA. ATTY TO SUBMIT DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS ATTORNEY PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION; Judge: SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE; Location: PRE-TRIAL/MEDIATION ROOM 1400; Result: RESET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketEntry: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketEntry: SMALL CLAIMS ATTORNEY PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION SET FOR 04/05/2019 AT 10:30 AM IN 1400 BEFORE JUDGE: SANDERS, GABRIELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED:1/31/19 PARTY SERVED: EDGAR CHAVEZ(CO-RESIDENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2019001309

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketEntry: SMALL CLAIMS ATTORNEY PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION SET FOR 03/01/2019 AT 9:30 AM IN 1400 BEFORE JUDGE: SANDERS, GABRIELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: $ 1713.80 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/02/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019 SC 000012 SP

    Read MoreRead Less