This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 01/10/2021 at 03:13:48 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC vs. BENCOSME, FELIX

Case Summary

On 12/26/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BENCOSME, FELIX. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS, GABRIELLE and SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 SP

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS, GABRIELLE

SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

BENCOSME, FELIX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TEAL, BROOKE E

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT AS TO COURT COSTS

2/18/2020: AFFIDAVIT AS TO COURT COSTS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY STATUS

2/18/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY STATUS

MOTION FOR DEFAULT (2/21/20) DEFAULT

2/18/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT (2/21/20) DEFAULT

PRE-TRIAL HEARING. DEF. FTA. ATTY TO SUBMIT DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT

2/4/2020: PRE-TRIAL HEARING. DEF. FTA. ATTY TO SUBMIT DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE

1/15/2020: NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE

SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 12/31/19 PARTY SERVED: FELIX BENCOSME

1/8/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 12/31/19 PARTY SERVED: FELIX BENCOSME

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2019125912

12/27/2019: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2019125912

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

12/26/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/26/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/23/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

$792.38 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/23/2019: $792.38 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/23/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED (OR.5684.2339. / 2020030758)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketEntry: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT AS TO COURT COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR DEFAULT (2/21/20) DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS ATTORNEY PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION; Judge: SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE; Location: PRE-TRIAL/MEDIATION ROOM 1400; Result: DEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PRE-TRIAL HEARING. DEF. FTA. ATTY TO SUBMIT DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 12/31/19 PARTY SERVED: FELIX BENCOSME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2019125912

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketEntry: SMALL CLAIMS ATTORNEY PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION SET FOR 02/04/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN 1400 BEFORE JUDGE: SANDERS, GABRIELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 12/26/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019 SC 004803 SP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: $792.38 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TEAL, BROOKE ELIZABETH