This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 03/06/2022 at 22:43:38 (UTC).

VARTIC, VERONICA vs CAMACHO TORRES, JOSE RICARDO

Case Summary

On 12/20/2021 VARTIC, VERONICA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CAMACHO TORRES, JOSE RICARDO. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 DS

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VARTIC, VERONICA

Respondent

CAMACHO TORRES, JOSE RICARDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WECHSLER, MERCEDES R.

Respondent Attorney

VALLENLLANES CAUTHORN, CRISTINA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketEntry: CANCELLATION OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketEntry: APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS (DENIED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketEntry: APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER TO WIFES VERIFIED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE INCLUDING RELATED RELIEF & COUNTER PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT AND DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketEntry: CANCELLATION OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketEntry: DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST JOSE (EMAILED ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: (12/27/2021) PARTY SERVED: JOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEntry: COPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE VERONICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER FOR BOTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE INCLUDING RELATED RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEntry: COVER SHEET CASE AT ISSUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 12/21/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 DR 004827 DS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAUTHORN, CRISTINA VALLELLANES