This case was last updated from Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County on 01/12/2021 at 14:09:08 (UTC).

PEGUERO, TERESA vs. VARGAS, ARIS RAFAEL

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 PEGUERO, TERESA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against VARGAS, ARIS RAFAEL. This case was filed in Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MURPHY, MICHAEL and EGAN, ROBERT J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 AN

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MURPHY, MICHAEL

EGAN, ROBERT J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEGUERO, TERESA

Defendants

VARGAS, ARIS RAFAEL

MARCO'S FRANCHISING, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLEAKLEY, JUSTIN M

Defendant Attorney

FRUMP, CHRISTOPHER KENNETH

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF REQUEST TO PRODUCE

7/28/2020: DEFENDANT RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF REQUEST TO PRODUCE

PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2020038759

5/1/2020: PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2020038759

DEFENDANT RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF REQUEST TO PRODUCE

7/28/2020: DEFENDANT RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

5/22/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES INTERROGATORIES

7/30/2020: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

5/22/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE

5/22/2020: NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

5/22/2020: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

5/22/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEFENDNAT MARCO FRANCHISING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES TO MARCO'S FRANCHISING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketEntry: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT MARCOS FRANCHISING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT ARIS RAFAEL VARGAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT MARCOS FRANCHISISNG LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT ARIS RAFAEL VARGAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 04/29/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CA 001197 AN

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Marco's Franchising, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLEAKLEY, JUSTIN M