This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 07/05/2022 at 17:04:42 (UTC).

PALAZZOLO, KATHERINE vs PALAZZOLO, MARK

Case Summary

On 05/06/2022 PALAZZOLO, KATHERINE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PALAZZOLO, MARK. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NETCHER, ERIC J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 DS

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NETCHER, ERIC J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PALAZZOLO, KATHERINE

Respondent

PALAZZOLO, MARK

Not Yet Classified

Z.P.

B.P.

S.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MENTZER, KRISTIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketEntry: PRELIMINARY FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (LONG FORM) FOR KATHERINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 05/09/2022 PARTY SERVED: MARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2022044975; Applied Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2022044975

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2022043280; Applied Amount: $407.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $407.50 RECEIPT #2022043280

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketEntry: UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING WIFE'S PARENTING COURSE CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER FOR KATHERINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketEntry: AMENDED ORDER IMPLEMENTING A STANDING TEMPORARY ORDER FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE ACTIONS WITH OR WITHOUT MINOR CHILDREN, ORANGE & OSCEOLA COUNTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketEntry: WIFE'S VERIFIED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketEntry: COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 05/06/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 DR 001801 DS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where BP, P.L.C. is a litigant