This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 01/05/2021 at 20:12:28 (UTC).

OUTRIGGER INC vs. SANCHEZ SANTIAGO, ROSA

Case Summary

On 03/14/2019 OUTRIGGER INC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against SANCHEZ SANTIAGO, ROSA. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS, GABRIELLE and SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 EV

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS, GABRIELLE

SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OUTRIGGER INC

Defendant

SANCHEZ SANTIAGO, ROSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARRON, JAMES I III

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S REGISTRY CHECK MAILED

5/14/2019: CLERK'S REGISTRY CHECK MAILED

CHECK REQUEST

4/17/2019: CHECK REQUEST

COURT NOTES: CK #20765 MAILED BACK TO THE ATTY PER FAX REQUEST

4/8/2019: COURT NOTES: CK #20765 MAILED BACK TO THE ATTY PER FAX REQUEST

FAX FROM ATTY'S OFFICE TO STOP ALL PROCEEDINGS

4/8/2019: FAX FROM ATTY'S OFFICE TO STOP ALL PROCEEDINGS

MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION: RESIDENTAL EVICTION (COUNT I)

4/4/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION: RESIDENTAL EVICTION (COUNT I)

SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED, DATE SERVED: 3/16/19 PERSON SERVED: ROSE SANCHEZ SANTIAGO

4/4/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED, DATE SERVED: 3/16/19 PERSON SERVED: ROSE SANCHEZ SANTIAGO

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE AND PROPER VENUE AFFIDAVIT AS TO SUPPORT OF FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

4/4/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE AND PROPER VENUE AFFIDAVIT AS TO SUPPORT OF FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

4/4/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

PAYMENT $21.17 RECEIPT #2019028419

3/19/2019: PAYMENT $21.17 RECEIPT #2019028419

PAYMENT $911.00 RECEIPT #2019028416

3/19/2019: PAYMENT $911.00 RECEIPT #2019028416

ANSWER FROM THE DEFENDANT

3/19/2019: ANSWER FROM THE DEFENDANT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

3/19/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2019027256

3/15/2019: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2019027256

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

3/14/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

3/14/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

3/14/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CLERK'S REGISTRY CHECK MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CHECK REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketEntry: ORDER TO SET ASIDE FINAL JUDGMENT ADOPT STIPULATION AGREEMENT RELEASE THE FUNDS AND DISMISS CASE - RECORDED (OR.5508.2564. / 2019048569)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketEntry: MOTION BY PLAINTIFF TO SET ASIDE FINAL JUDGMENT ADOPT STIPULATION AGREEMENT RELEASE THE FUNDS AND DISMISS CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketEntry: STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COURT NOTES: CK #20765 MAILED BACK TO THE ATTY PER FAX REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: FAX FROM ATTY'S OFFICE TO STOP ALL PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION: RESIDENTAL EVICTION (COUNT I)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED, DATE SERVED: 3/16/19 PERSON SERVED: ROSE SANCHEZ SANTIAGO

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $21.17 RECEIPT #2019028419

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $911.00 RECEIPT #2019028416

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER FROM THE DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2019027256

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 03/14/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019 CC 000800 EV

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OUTRIGGER INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARRON JAMES I III