This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 02/24/2020 at 19:01:45 (UTC).

OSCEOLA SC LLC vs. MONDRAGON, YESIKA T

Case Summary

On 06/15/2017 OSCEOLA SC LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MONDRAGON, YESIKA T. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE and EPPERSON, HAL C JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 SP

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE

EPPERSON, HAL C JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OSCEOLA SC LLC

Defendant

MONDRAGON, YESIKA T

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEELE, ANTHONY J. ESQ

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF DEFAULT IN STIPULATION\SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

7/17/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF DEFAULT IN STIPULATION\SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED ON 11/15/17 FOR YESIKA T MONDRAGON

12/6/2017: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED ON 11/15/17 FOR YESIKA T MONDRAGON

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

11/3/2017: ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2017105060

11/2/2017: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2017105060

ALIAS SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/17/2017: ALIAS SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR YESIKA T MONDRAGON

7/7/2017: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR YESIKA T MONDRAGON

DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

6/20/2017: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

6/16/2017: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017060463

6/16/2017: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017060463

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

6/15/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

6/15/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

$4766.08 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

6/15/2017: $4766.08 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED (OR.5562.2771. / 2019096354)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT OF DEFAULT IN STIPULATION\SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT BASED ON DEFAULT IN STIPULATION\SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketEntry: SETTLEMENT STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ORDER AND DISMISSAL (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketEntry: SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS ATTORNEY PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION; Judge: EPPERSON, HAL C JR; Location: PRE-TRIAL/MEDIATION ROOM 1400; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DocketEntry: SETTLEMENT STIPULATION AGREEMENT ORDER AND DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DocketEntry: SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED ON 11/15/17 FOR YESIKA T MONDRAGON

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2017
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS ATTORNEY PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION; Judge: EPPERSON, HAL C JR; Location: PRE-TRIAL/MEDIATION ROOM 1400; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR YESIKA T MONDRAGON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017060463

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketEntry: SMALL CLAIMS ATTORNEY PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION SET FOR 07/14/2017 AT 9:30 AM IN 1400 BEFORE JUDGE: EPPERSON, HAL C JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: $4766.08 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 06/15/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 SC 002445 SP

    Read MoreRead Less