This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/16/2020 at 15:43:46 (UTC).

OSCEOLA SC LLC DBA ST CLOUD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTE vs. HOLLIDAY, CATHIE

Case Summary

On 06/01/2017 OSCEOLA SC LLC DBA ST CLOUD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTE filed an Other lawsuit against HOLLIDAY, CATHIE. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 CL

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Osceola County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OSCEOLA SC LLC DBA ST CLOUD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTE

Defendant

HOLLIDAY, CATHIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEELE, ANTHONY J. ESQ

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT $60.00 RECEIPT #2019082981

8/23/2019: PAYMENT $60.00 RECEIPT #2019082981

PAYMENT $60.00 RECEIPT #2019082928

8/23/2019: PAYMENT $60.00 RECEIPT #2019082928

NOTICE OF MEDIATION

6/28/2019: NOTICE OF MEDIATION

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS AND INTEREST

11/2/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS AND INTEREST

ANSWER BY CATHIE HOLLIDAY

6/28/2017: ANSWER BY CATHIE HOLLIDAY

SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 6/12/17 PARTY SERVED:CATHIE HOLLIDAY

6/19/2017: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 6/12/17 PARTY SERVED:CATHIE HOLLIDAY

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017055677

6/2/2017: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017055677

DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

6/1/2017: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED CATHIE HOLLIDAY (EMAILED TO ATTY)

6/1/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED CATHIE HOLLIDAY (EMAILED TO ATTY)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

6/1/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

6/1/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketEntry: SETTLEMENT STIPULATION\SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ORDER AND DISMISSAL - RECORDED (OR.5592.1530. / 2019121490)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketEntry: SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • HearingEvent: COUNTY MEDIATION; Judge: SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE; Location: PRE-TRIAL/MEDIATION ROOM 1400

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATE OF ATTENDANCE AND AUTHORITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $60.00 RECEIPT #2019082981

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $60.00 RECEIPT #2019082928

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketEntry: COUNTY MEDIATION SET FOR 08/23/2019 AT 10:00 AM IN 1400 BEFORE JUDGE: SANDERS, GABRIELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER BY CATHIE HOLLIDAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 6/12/17 PARTY SERVED:CATHIE HOLLIDAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017055677

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED CATHIE HOLLIDAY (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 06/01/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 CC 001329 CL

    Read MoreRead Less