This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/31/2020 at 12:41:05 (UTC).

OSCEOLA INJURY CLINIC vs. GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 OSCEOLA INJURY CLINIC filed an Other lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 CL

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Osceola County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OSCEOLA INJURY CLINIC

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVIES, KEVIN

Defendant Attorney

JACKSON-BERNHARDT, ROBIN D

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

11/30/2020: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

11/24/2020: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

11/17/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/31/2020: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT

3/27/2020: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

2/13/2020: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

4/2/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

3/11/2019: PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

2/27/2019: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

2/26/2019: PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

2/21/2019: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO THE DEFENDANT

1/23/2019: NOTICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO THE DEFENDANT

DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

1/23/2019: DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

1/17/2019: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, DISCLOSURE, AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

1/17/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, DISCLOSURE, AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

1/2/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/2/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/2/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT TO PROVIDE DEPOSITION DATES FOR DEFENDANT'S ADJUTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketEntry: AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, DISCLOSURE, AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019000745

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/02/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019 CC 000015 CL

    Read MoreRead Less