This case was last updated from Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/21/2023 at 21:50:40 (UTC).

OSCEOLA COUNTY, FLORIDA vs. SOLEIL BLU WEST ELEVEN LLC FKA DEANCURT ST. CLOUD

Case Summary

On 08/04/2022 OSCEOLA COUNTY, FLORIDA filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against SOLEIL BLU WEST ELEVEN LLC FKA DEANCURT ST CLOUD. This case was filed in Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are EGAN, ROBERT J, YOUNG, TOM and CARSTEN, KEITH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 ED

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

EGAN, ROBERT J

YOUNG, TOM

CARSTEN, KEITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OSCEOLA COUNTY, FLORIDA

Defendants

SOLEIL BLU WEST ELEVEN LLC FKA DEANCURT ST. CLOUD

FANNIE MAE

ORLANDO UTILITIES COMMISSION OF THE CITY OF ORLAND

CITY OF ST. CLOUD

UNKNOWN BENEFICIARIES

RGSC HOLDINGS, LLC

SPECTRUM SUNSHINE STATE, LLC

BNOB X LLC

ORLANDO UTILITIES COMMISSION

UNKNOWN TENANTS AND OTHER PARTIES IN POSSESSION

UNKNOWN HEIRS OR BENEFICIARIES

BRUCE VICKERS, OSCEOLA COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

Not Yet Classified

NR PARCEL 757

NR PARCEL 794

NR PARCEL 796A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID, A SHONTZ ESQ

Defendant Attorneys

HILDRETH, MARK D

CREWS, RACHAEL M

CALLAN, THOMAS P. ESQ

 

Court Documents

STIPULATED ORDER OF TAKING AND FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO RESPONDENT SOLIEL BLU WEST ELEVEN,= LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION F/K/A DEANCURT ST CLOUD LLC BY NEPSA MANAGER LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION, ITS MANAGER BY NEPSA PRO

11/22/2022: STIPULATED ORDER OF TAKING AND FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO RESPONDENT SOLIEL BLU WEST ELEVEN,= LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION F/K/A DEANCURT ST CLOUD LLC BY NEPSA MANAGER LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION, ITS MANAGER BY NEPSA PROPERTY INVESTORS, INC., A MASSACHUSETTS CORPORATION, ITS MANAGER FRED ANTHONY, PRESIDENT'S INTEREST IN PARCEL NR 757

ORDER OF TAKING AS TO NR PARCEL 757, NR PARCEL 794, AND NR PARCEL 796A - RECORDED (OR.6321.1986. / 2022171588)

9/27/2022: ORDER OF TAKING AS TO NR PARCEL 757, NR PARCEL 794, AND NR PARCEL 796A - RECORDED (OR.6321.1986. / 2022171588)

PETITION IN EMINEN DOMAIN

8/4/2022: PETITION IN EMINEN DOMAIN

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT

10/19/2022: NOTICE OF DEPOSIT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

10/14/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

PAYMENT $1,970.00 RECEIPT #2022094912

10/14/2022: PAYMENT $1,970.00 RECEIPT #2022094912

PAYMENT $1,270.00 RECEIPT #2022094907

10/14/2022: PAYMENT $1,270.00 RECEIPT #2022094907

PAYMENT $66,770.00 RECEIPT #2022093571

10/12/2022: PAYMENT $66,770.00 RECEIPT #2022093571

EXHIBITS FOR IDENTIFICATION/EVIDENCE

9/27/2022: EXHIBITS FOR IDENTIFICATION/EVIDENCE

NOTICE OF FILING ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE AND WAIVER OF FORMAL SERVICE OF PROCESS

9/19/2022: NOTICE OF FILING ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE AND WAIVER OF FORMAL SERVICE OF PROCESS

RESPONDENT NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

9/1/2022: RESPONDENT NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

8/4/2022: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

NOTICE OF HEARING

8/10/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketEntry: JUDICIAL DEFAULT AND FINAL JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT AGAINST THE NAMED RESPONDENTS - RECORDED (OR.6334.1716. / 2022183502)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketEntry: PETITIONER OSCEOLA COUNTY MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT AND FINAL JUDGMENT BY JUDICIAL DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketEntry: CHECK REQUEST TO TRUST ACCOUNT OF ASHUMAKER LOOP & KENDRICK LLP FOR THE BENEFIT OF SOLEIL BLU WEST LLC (SENT TO ACCT ON 12/19/22)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketEntry: DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST DEFENDANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Judge: EGAN, ROBERT J; Location: COURTROOM 5C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketEntry: ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW FUNDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketEntry: MOTION HEARING SET FOR 12/15/2022 AT 8:30 AM IN 5C BEFORE JUDGE: EGAN, ROBERT J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketEntry: PETITIONER OSCEOLA COUNTY MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT AND ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketEntry: UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAWAL FUNDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $427.50 RECEIPT #2022072830

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketEntry: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AND WATER MANAGEMENT DISTRICT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DECLARATION OF TAKING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketEntry: PETITTIONER, OSCEOLA COUNTY, FLORIDA'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketEntry: GENERAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PETITION IN EMINEN DOMAIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 08/04/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CA 002037 ED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less