This case was last updated from Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/21/2023 at 10:46:48 (UTC).

OSCEOLA COUNTY FLORIDA vs. MULBERRY 114 LLC

Case Summary

On 06/07/2022 OSCEOLA COUNTY FLORIDA filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against MULBERRY 114 LLC. This case was filed in Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are YOUNG, TOM and EGAN, ROBERT J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 ED

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

YOUNG, TOM

EGAN, ROBERT J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OSCEOLA COUNTY FLORIDA

Defendants

MULBERRY 114 LLC

CITY OF ST. CLOUD

GENERAL CONSTRUCTION ASSOCIATES INC.

OUTBACK STEAKHOUSE OF FLORIDA LLC

THE PANTRY INC.

BP DEVELOPMENT AND MANAGEMENT CORPORATION

SEMBLER, MEL

WAL-MART STORES INC.

OSCEOLA FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION

LIVING WELL HEALTH CENTER OF CENTRAL FLORIDA INC.

NUBAID OF ORLANDO INC.

MIZU TEPPANYAKI & SUSHI II LLC

GREENBERG DENTAL & ORTHODONTICS P.A.

SELECT PHYSICAL THERAPY HOLDINGS INC.

SCFL LLC

CINDERELLA BALLROOM & EVENTS LLC

LOVE MY PHONE LLC

RBD ENTERPRISE GROUP LLC

DREAM CUT BY JAMILE GEZAT LLC

59 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID, A SHONTZ ESQ

Defendant Attorneys

HIPP, KENT L ESQUIRE

BENTLEY, MARK S

Other Attorneys

RILEY, JAMES M.

DEGEL, SUMMER ELAINE

POWELL, GEORGE WASHINGTON JR

CREWS, RACHAEL M

 

Court Documents

AGREED ORDER TAXING FEES AND COSTS TO NR PARCELS 161/761 AND NR PARCELS 163/863 AND JOINT MOTION

10/26/2022: AGREED ORDER TAXING FEES AND COSTS TO NR PARCELS 161/761 AND NR PARCELS 163/863 AND JOINT MOTION

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT

10/3/2022: NOTICE OF DEPOSIT

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DAMAGE CLAIMS

8/12/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DAMAGE CLAIMS

ANSWER TO PETITION IN EMINENT DOMAIN AND NOTICE OF TAXES DUE

8/11/2022: ANSWER TO PETITION IN EMINENT DOMAIN AND NOTICE OF TAXES DUE

STIPULATED ORDER OF TAKING AS TO NR PARCEL 179, NR PARCEL 779 AND NR PARCEL 879 (AS TO RESPONDENTS JOHN TREGRE AND JOHN TREGRE, A SOLE PROPRIETORSHIP. WITH DISBURSEMENT INSTRUCTIONS TO THE CLERK)

9/12/2022: STIPULATED ORDER OF TAKING AS TO NR PARCEL 179, NR PARCEL 779 AND NR PARCEL 879 (AS TO RESPONDENTS JOHN TREGRE AND JOHN TREGRE, A SOLE PROPRIETORSHIP. WITH DISBURSEMENT INSTRUCTIONS TO THE CLERK)

STIPULATED ORDER OF TAKING AS TO NR PARCEL 163 AND NR PARCEL 863 (AS TO RESPONDENT NADG NNN VRIZN SG (STC-FL) LP, A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP)

9/12/2022: STIPULATED ORDER OF TAKING AS TO NR PARCEL 163 AND NR PARCEL 863 (AS TO RESPONDENT NADG NNN VRIZN SG (STC-FL) LP, A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP)

ORDER OF TAKING AS TO NR PARCEL 161. NR PARCEL 761, NR PARCEL 163, NR PARCEL 863, NR PARCEL 179, NR PARCEL 779, NR PARCEL 879, NR PARCEL 792 NR PARCEL 1703, NR PARCEL 1104 AND NR PARCEL 1704

9/12/2022: ORDER OF TAKING AS TO NR PARCEL 161. NR PARCEL 761, NR PARCEL 163, NR PARCEL 863, NR PARCEL 179, NR PARCEL 779, NR PARCEL 879, NR PARCEL 792 NR PARCEL 1703, NR PARCEL 1104 AND NR PARCEL 1704

STIPULATED ORDER OF TAKING AS TO NR PARCEL 163 AND NR PARCEL 863 (AS TO RESPONDENT CELLULAR SALE OF NORTHERN FLORIDA, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY)

9/12/2022: STIPULATED ORDER OF TAKING AS TO NR PARCEL 163 AND NR PARCEL 863 (AS TO RESPONDENT CELLULAR SALE OF NORTHERN FLORIDA, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY)

STIPULATED ORDER OF TAKING AS TO NR PARCEL 163 AND NR PARCEL 863 (AS TO RESPONDENT MELVIN . SEMBLER)

9/12/2022: STIPULATED ORDER OF TAKING AS TO NR PARCEL 163 AND NR PARCEL 863 (AS TO RESPONDENT MELVIN . SEMBLER)

STIPULATED ORDER OF TAKING AS TO NR PARCEL 161 AND NR PARCEL 761 (AS TO RESPONDENT MULBERRY 114, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY)

9/12/2022: STIPULATED ORDER OF TAKING AS TO NR PARCEL 161 AND NR PARCEL 761 (AS TO RESPONDENT MULBERRY 114, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY)

PETITIONER, OSCEOLA COUNTY, FLORIDA'S, MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF ORDER OF TAKING

9/9/2022: PETITIONER, OSCEOLA COUNTY, FLORIDA'S, MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF ORDER OF TAKING

RESPONDENT ORLANDO UTILITIES COMMISSION OF THE CITY OF ORLANDO, FLORIDA'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

9/9/2022: RESPONDENT ORLANDO UTILITIES COMMISSION OF THE CITY OF ORLANDO, FLORIDA'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

PETITIONER, OSCEOLA COUNTY, FLORIDA'S, NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY/ RESPONDENT, CITY OF ST. CLOUD, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION, AS TO PARCELS NR-163 AND NR-863

9/9/2022: PETITIONER, OSCEOLA COUNTY, FLORIDA'S, NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY/ RESPONDENT, CITY OF ST. CLOUD, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION, AS TO PARCELS NR-163 AND NR-863

PETITIONER, OSCEOLA COUNTY, FLORIDA'S, NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY/ RESPONDENT, CITY OF ST. CLOUD, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION, AS TO PARCELS NR-161 AND NR-761

9/8/2022: PETITIONER, OSCEOLA COUNTY, FLORIDA'S, NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY/ RESPONDENT, CITY OF ST. CLOUD, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION, AS TO PARCELS NR-161 AND NR-761

AMENDED DECLARATION OF TAKING

9/8/2022: AMENDED DECLARATION OF TAKING

NADG NNN VRIZN SG LP NOTICE OF APPEARANCE DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES AND DEMAND FOR FORMAL ORDER OF TAKING HEARING

8/10/2022: NADG NNN VRIZN SG LP NOTICE OF APPEARANCE DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES AND DEMAND FOR FORMAL ORDER OF TAKING HEARING

PETITIONER OSCEOLA COUNTY FLORIDA NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY RESPONDENT SOS FURNITURE COMPANY INC A FLORIDA CORPORATION AS TO PARCELS NR 163 AND NR 863

8/8/2022: PETITIONER OSCEOLA COUNTY FLORIDA NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY RESPONDENT SOS FURNITURE COMPANY INC A FLORIDA CORPORATION AS TO PARCELS NR 163 AND NR 863

ANSWER OF RESPONDENT CELLULAR SALES OF NORTHERN FLORIDA, LLC TO PETITION IN EMINENT DOMAIN

8/3/2022: ANSWER OF RESPONDENT CELLULAR SALES OF NORTHERN FLORIDA, LLC TO PETITION IN EMINENT DOMAIN

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST AS TO PARCELS NR 161/761 AND NR 163/863 OF RESPONDENT WALMART STORES INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketEntry: PETITIONER OSCEOLA COUNTY FLORIDA NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY RESPONDENT WALMART STORES INC A DELAWARE CORPORATION AS TO PARCELS NR 161/761 AND NR 163/863

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketEntry: CELLULAR SALES OF NORTHERN FLORIDA LLC RESPONSE TO PETITIONER FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketEntry: JUDICIAL DEFAULT AND FINAL JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT AGAINST THE NAMED REPONDENTS - RECORDED (OR.6334.1628. / 2022183487)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketEntry: PETITIONER OSCEOLA COUNTY MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT AND FINAL JUDGMENT BY JUDICIAL DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketEntry: DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST DEFENDANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketEntry: PETITIONER OSCEOLA COUNTY MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT AND ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketEntry: PETITIONER'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO CELLULAR SALES OF NORTHERN FLORIDA, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: CHECK REQUEST MAILED TO TRUT ACCT OF FISHBACK DOMINICK LLP C/O KURT ARDAMAN ESQ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AGREED ORDER TAXING FEES AND COSTS TO NR PARCELS 161/761 AND NR PARCELS 163/863 AND JOINT MOTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
124 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2022055196; Applied Amount: $580.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $580.00 RECEIPT #2022055196

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AND WATER MANAGEMENT DISTRICT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DECLARATION OF TAKING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: PETITIONER OSCEOLA COUNTY FLORIDA'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PETITION IN EMINENT DOMAIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: GENERAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 06/07/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CA 001507 ED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less