This case was last updated from Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County on 01/30/2021 at 06:13:05 (UTC).

ORLANDO RESORT DEVELOPMENT GROUP INC vs. LEE, RICHARD A.

Case Summary

On 03/04/2015 ORLANDO RESORT DEVELOPMENT GROUP INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against LEE, RICHARD A. This case was filed in Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WEISS, KEVIN B. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 MF

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WEISS, KEVIN B

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORLANDO RESORT DEVELOPMENT GROUP INC

Defendants

HAMMOND, JOAN B.

CALLAHAN, DANIEL M.

TRUSTEE OF THE MERRITT FAMILY TRUST DATED OCTOBER 1,2005

INC., GRUBY

HARRISON, JACQUIE

HARRISON, AVERY

MARKEWICH, MATTHEW

MOORE, MICHELLE R.

MARKEWICH, ERIK

LEE, RICHARD A.

KING, CHRISTIAN

GUARCELLO, VINCENT

HARTWELL, BARBARA J.

ANY SPOUSES, HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES, LIENORS, CREDITORS, TRUSTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS, BY, THROUGH, UNDER OR AGAINST NORMA C. MEDNICK

ALFONSO, MAGALY

ALFONSO, III, OSCAR

Q.M. CORPORATION

KROL, STANLEY

ANY SPOUSES, HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES, LIENORS, CREDITORS, TRUSTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS, BY, THROUGH, UNDER OR AGAINST JACOB A MEDNICK

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EARLY, TARA C ESQ

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS AND PROOF OF DEBT AS TO COUNT XV

4/15/2015: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS AND PROOF OF DEBT AS TO COUNT XV

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS AND PROOF OF DEBT AS TO COUNT XII

4/15/2015: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS AND PROOF OF DEBT AS TO COUNT XII

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS AND PROOF OF DEBT AS TO COUNT XI

4/15/2015: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS AND PROOF OF DEBT AS TO COUNT XI

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS AND PROOF OF DEBT AS TO COUNT X

4/15/2015: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS AND PROOF OF DEBT AS TO COUNT X

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS AND PROOF OF DEBT AS TO COUNT IX

4/15/2015: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS AND PROOF OF DEBT AS TO COUNT IX

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS AND PROOF OF DEBT AS TO COUNT VIII

4/15/2015: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS AND PROOF OF DEBT AS TO COUNT VIII

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS AND PROOF OF DEBT AS TO COUNT VII

4/15/2015: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS AND PROOF OF DEBT AS TO COUNT VII

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS AND PROOF OF DEBT AS TO COUNT VI

4/15/2015: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS AND PROOF OF DEBT AS TO COUNT VI

DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTY

3/6/2015: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTY

CERTIFICATE OF TITLE (REC)

10/5/2015: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE (REC)

CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS

9/10/2015: CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS

CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

9/10/2015: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE AS TO COUNTS I, II, III, V, VI, VIII, X, XI, XII, XIV, XV

4/28/2015: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE AS TO COUNTS I, II, III, V, VI, VIII, X, XI, XII, XIV, XV

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS AND PROOF OF DEBT AS TO COUNT XIV

4/15/2015: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS AND PROOF OF DEBT AS TO COUNT XIV

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE COUNT XIII / QM CORPORATION AND DANIEL M CALLAHAN

3/12/2015: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE COUNT XIII / QM CORPORATION AND DANIEL M CALLAHAN

PAYMENT $1,342.50 RECEIPT #2015031567

3/6/2015: PAYMENT $1,342.50 RECEIPT #2015031567

SUMMONS ISSUED ( EMAILED TO ATTY )

3/6/2015: SUMMONS ISSUED ( EMAILED TO ATTY )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

3/4/2015: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2015
  • DocketEntry: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $980.00 RECEIPT #2015110029

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • HearingEvent: MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SALE; Judge: FORECLOSURE SALES; Location: ROOM 2600 SUITE 2602

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF SALE ($100.00 PL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SALE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • DocketEntry: PROOF OF PUBLICATION, FIRST PUBLICATION DATE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT IN FORECLOSURE BY DEFAULT (IN REM) (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2015
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS OF UNDETERMINED MILITARY STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $1,342.50 RECEIPT #2015031567

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED ( EMAILED TO ATTY )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • DocketEntry: VERIFIED CLAIM OF LIEN FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 03/04/2015 CASE NUMBER 2015 CA 000543 MF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ORLANDO RESORT DEVELOPMENT GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ANY SPOUSES HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LEINORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Early, Tara C, ESQ.