This case was last updated from Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County on 01/30/2021 at 06:35:57 (UTC).

ORLANDO RESORT DEVELOPMENT GROUP INC vs. GENEREAX, ALAN

Case Summary

On 03/05/2015 ORLANDO RESORT DEVELOPMENT GROUP INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against GENEREAX, ALAN. This case was filed in Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is POLODNA, SCOTT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 MF

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

POLODNA, SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORLANDO RESORT DEVELOPMENT GROUP INC

Defendants

HALAS, CHERYL

MORGAN, STEVEN L

SAMUEL F FENNER DECEASED

GREEN, SHAWNDRIAH

GRACE, MICHAEL DAVID

GINN, KELLY

GOLDSTEIN, ROBERT

HYNSON, MARY E

HOULE, ANGELA Y

GILBERTO, ANTHONY J

HAHN, KRICHIN M

GINN, EUGENE JR

HUTCHINS, BETTY L

HARTNETT, JUDITH A

HYNSON, HAROLD E SR

ANY SPOUSES HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST SAMUEL F FENNER DECEASED

MORGAN, SHERRY L

JEFFERSON, ANDRE

HARTNETT, THOMAS A

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EARLY, TARA C ESQ

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENTS

8/16/2016: CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENTS

CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

8/16/2016: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST VALERIE L. GILBERTO, DECEASED, BROCK E. HOULE AND ANGELA Y. HOULE

6/23/2016: DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST VALERIE L. GILBERTO, DECEASED, BROCK E. HOULE AND ANGELA Y. HOULE

CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENTS

10/16/2015: CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENTS

CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

10/16/2015: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

SALE SHEET

10/5/2015: SALE SHEET

CERTIFICATE OF SALE ($100.00 PL)

10/5/2015: CERTIFICATE OF SALE ($100.00 PL)

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS AND PROOF OF DEBTAS TO COUNT I

4/16/2015: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS AND PROOF OF DEBTAS TO COUNT I

PAYMENT $1,317.50 RECEIPT #2015032241

3/9/2015: PAYMENT $1,317.50 RECEIPT #2015032241

NOTICE OF SALE

8/17/2015: NOTICE OF SALE

DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST ALAN GENEREAX; MELADY GENEREAX; KELLY GINN; EUGENE GINN JR; ROBERT GOLDSTEIN; MICHAEL DAVID GRACE; SHAWNDRIAH GREEN; KRICHIN M. HAHN; CHERYL HALAS; ANDRE JEFFERSON; THOMAS A. HARTNETT; JUDITH A. HARTNETT; SAMUEL F. FENNER DECEASED; BETTY L. HUTCHINS; HAROLD E. HYNSON SR; MARY E. HYNSON; STEVEN L. MORGAN AND SHERRY L. MORGAN

7/6/2015: DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST ALAN GENEREAX; MELADY GENEREAX; KELLY GINN; EUGENE GINN JR; ROBERT GOLDSTEIN; MICHAEL DAVID GRACE; SHAWNDRIAH GREEN; KRICHIN M. HAHN; CHERYL HALAS; ANDRE JEFFERSON; THOMAS A. HARTNETT; JUDITH A. HARTNETT; SAMUEL F. FENNER DECEASED; BETTY L. HUTCHINS; HAROLD E. HYNSON SR; MARY E. HYNSON; STEVEN L. MORGAN AND SHERRY L. MORGAN

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS AND PROOF OF DEBTAS TO COUNT XV

4/16/2015: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS AND PROOF OF DEBTAS TO COUNT XV

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS AND PROOF OF DEBTAS TO COUNT XIV

4/16/2015: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS AND PROOF OF DEBTAS TO COUNT XIV

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS AND PROOF OF DEBTAS TO COUNT III

4/16/2015: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS AND PROOF OF DEBTAS TO COUNT III

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED ATTY)

3/9/2015: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED ATTY)

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

3/5/2015: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

3/5/2015: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

3/5/2015: CIVIL COVER SHEET

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • HearingEvent: MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SALE; Judge: FORECLOSURE SALES; Location: ROOM 2600 SUITE 2602

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF SALE ($100.00 PL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SALE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $140.00 RECEIPT #2016085603

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • DocketEntry: PROOF OF PUBLICATION, FIRST PUBLICATION DATE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • DocketEntry: SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE (IN REM) AS TO COUNTS II AND X ONLY (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2015
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS OF UNDETERMINED MILITARY STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $1,317.50 RECEIPT #2015032241

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • DocketEntry: VERIFIED CLAIM OF LIEN FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 03/05/2015 CASE NUMBER 2015 CA 000546 MF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ORLANDO RESORT DEVELOPMENT GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Early, Tara C, ESQ.