This case was last updated from Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County on 01/29/2021 at 13:29:26 (UTC).

ORLANDO RESORT DEVELOPMENT GROUP INC vs. BROWN, ANTONIO

Case Summary

On 01/29/2015 ORLANDO RESORT DEVELOPMENT GROUP INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BROWN, ANTONIO. This case was filed in Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WEISS, KEVIN B. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 MF

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WEISS, KEVIN B

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORLANDO RESORT DEVELOPMENT GROUP INC

Defendants

LANG, WILLIAM F.

BOULDEN, DECEASED, GENEVIEVE J.

ANTOINE, MARTIN

CLUB SELECT RESORTS

JOHN WILLIAM KELLER, AUTHORIZED AGENT

C AND S RESORT GETAWAY, LLC

AMERICAN CHILDREN'S CANCER ASSOCIATION

ELEET HOLDINGS, LLC

DROTLEFF, JUDITH C.

ELLIOT'S WORLD, LLC

BROWN, ANTONIO

ATKINSON, DECEASED, DONALD E.

BW CARTER PAINTING, INC.

ETT, LLC

LANG, CAROLYN R.

CHILDERS FAMILY TRUST, LLC

EMIDSOUTH, INC.

ATKINSON, DECEASED, SHIRLEY A.

LARRY A. WATSON, SIGNING OFFICER FOR EMIDSOUTH

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EARLY, TARA C ESQ

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

8/5/2015: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

PAYMENT $1,050.00 RECEIPT #2015094881

7/22/2015: PAYMENT $1,050.00 RECEIPT #2015094881

SALE SHEET

7/22/2015: SALE SHEET

CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENTS

6/22/2015: CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENTS

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE BY DEFAULT

5/18/2015: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE BY DEFAULT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY THE CLERK- 05/19- DEFAUL ENTERED AGAINST ANTONIO BROWN; WILLIAM F. LANG; CAROLYN R. LANG; AMERICAN CHILDREN'S CANCER ASSOCIATION; MARTIN ANTOINE; DONALD E. ATKINSON, DECEASED; SHIRLEY A. ATKINSON, DECEASED; GENEVIEVE J. BOULDEN, DECEASED; BW CARER PAINTING, INC.; C AND S RESORT GETAWAY, LLC; DANIEL GILLISPIE, AUTHORIZED AGENT; CLUB SELEC RESORTS; CHILDERS FAMILY TRUST, LLC; ELEET HOLDINGS, LLC; ELLIOT'S WORLD, LLC; EMIDSOUTH, INC.; LARR A. WATSON, SINING OFFICER FOR EMIDSOUTH, INC; ETT, LLC; JOHN WILLIAM KELLER, AUTHORIZED AGENT

5/18/2015: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY THE CLERK- 05/19- DEFAUL ENTERED AGAINST ANTONIO BROWN; WILLIAM F. LANG; CAROLYN R. LANG; AMERICAN CHILDREN'S CANCER ASSOCIATION; MARTIN ANTOINE; DONALD E. ATKINSON, DECEASED; SHIRLEY A. ATKINSON, DECEASED; GENEVIEVE J. BOULDEN, DECEASED; BW CARER PAINTING, INC.; C AND S RESORT GETAWAY, LLC; DANIEL GILLISPIE, AUTHORIZED AGENT; CLUB SELEC RESORTS; CHILDERS FAMILY TRUST, LLC; ELEET HOLDINGS, LLC; ELLIOT'S WORLD, LLC; EMIDSOUTH, INC.; LARR A. WATSON, SINING OFFICER FOR EMIDSOUTH, INC; ETT, LLC; JOHN WILLIAM KELLER, AUTHORIZED AGENT

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS, NON-MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF DEBT AS TO COUNT XV

3/6/2015: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS, NON-MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF DEBT AS TO COUNT XV

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS, NON-MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF DEBT AS TO COUNT XIII

3/6/2015: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS, NON-MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF DEBT AS TO COUNT XIII

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS, NON-MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF DEBT AS TO COUNT XI

3/6/2015: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS, NON-MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF DEBT AS TO COUNT XI

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS, NON-MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF DEBT AS TO COUNT IX

3/6/2015: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS, NON-MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF DEBT AS TO COUNT IX

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS, NON-MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF DEBT AS TO COUNT VIII

3/6/2015: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS, NON-MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF DEBT AS TO COUNT VIII

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS, NON-MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF DEBT AS TO COUNT VII

3/6/2015: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS, NON-MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF DEBT AS TO COUNT VII

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS, NON-MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF DEBT AS TO COUNT V

3/6/2015: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS, NON-MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF DEBT AS TO COUNT V

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS, NON-MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF DEBT AS TO COUNT IV

3/6/2015: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS, NON-MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF DEBT AS TO COUNT IV

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS, NON-MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF DEBT AS TO COUNT III

3/6/2015: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS, NON-MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF DEBT AS TO COUNT III

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS, NON-MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF DEBT AS TO COUNT II

3/6/2015: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS, NON-MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF DEBT AS TO COUNT II

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

2/3/2015: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

PAYMENT $787.50 RECEIPT #2015013861

2/2/2015: PAYMENT $787.50 RECEIPT #2015013861

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2015
  • DocketEntry: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • HearingEvent: MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SALE; Judge: FORECLOSURE SALES; Location: ROOM 2600 SUITE 2602

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $1,050.00 RECEIPT #2015094881

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SALE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • DocketEntry: PROOF OF PUBLICATION, FIRST PUBLICATION DATE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT IN FORECLOSURE BY DEFAULT IN REM ( REC )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2015
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS OF UNDETERMINED MILITARY STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $787.50 RECEIPT #2015013861

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • DocketEntry: VERIFIED COMPLAINT OF LIEN FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/29/2015 CASE NUMBER 2015 CA 000233 MF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ORLANDO RESORT DEVELOPMENT GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ETT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ELLIOT'S WORLD LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Club Select Resorts is a litigant