This case was last updated from Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County on 08/18/2021 at 22:07:49 (UTC).

OCONNOR, WILLIAM vs. LENNAR HOMES LLC

Case Summary

On 07/21/2021 OCONNOR, WILLIAM filed an Other lawsuit against LENNAR HOMES LLC. This case was filed in Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EGAN, ROBERT J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 OC

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EGAN, ROBERT J

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OCONNOR, WILLIAM

O'CONNER, CAROLYN

FAULKNER, KELLY

CARSTEN, STEPHANEE

GILCHRIST, STEVEN

GILCHRIST, CARMEN

WILLIAMS, DONNA

WILLIAMS, GAROLD

GIORGIO, KARLA C.

CROSS, NICHOLE

SMITH, STEPHEN T

SMITH, KYLIE

SCOTT, ALEX

KEMPF, JAMES

KEMPF, TOMOKO

REGIS, KENYATTA

MARSHALL-REGIS, NANDI

CLAUSEN, LYNNE

CUMBERMACK, DESIREE

Defendant

LENNAR HOMES LLC

44 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEMETRIADES, W TODD

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT $40.00 RECEIPT #2021072161

8/12/2021: PAYMENT $40.00 RECEIPT #2021072161

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

8/11/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER-GENERAL TRACK-

8/10/2021: STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER-GENERAL TRACK-

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

8/10/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

8/10/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

8/10/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

8/10/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2021066142

7/23/2021: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2021066142

COMPLAINT

7/21/2021: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/21/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2021072161; Applied Amount: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $40.00 RECEIPT #2021072161

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER-GENERAL TRACK-

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2021066142; Applied Amount: $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2021066142

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketEntry: E-MAIL CORRESPONDENCE - CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 07/22/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CA 002079 OC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LENNAR HOMES, LLC is a litigant