This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/18/2020 at 06:39:41 (UTC).

NORTHWEST FEDERAL CREDIT UNION vs. JONES, AUSTIN

Case Summary

On 10/13/2017 NORTHWEST FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed an Other lawsuit against JONES, AUSTIN. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EPPERSON, HAL C JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 CL

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Osceola County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EPPERSON, HAL C JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORTHWEST FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

JONES, AUSTIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

LOBELLO, THOMAS

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF REMITTING FUND'S TO GARNISHEE'S ATTORNEUY

2/18/2020: NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF REMITTING FUND'S TO GARNISHEE'S ATTORNEUY

VOLUNTARY NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AND DISSOLUTION OF GARNISHMENT

2/18/2020: VOLUNTARY NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AND DISSOLUTION OF GARNISHMENT

ANSWER OF GARNISHEE AND DEMAND FOR GARNISHMENT ATTORNEY FEE

9/19/2019: ANSWER OF GARNISHEE AND DEMAND FOR GARNISHMENT ATTORNEY FEE

SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 9/6/19 PARTY SERVED: EDUCATORS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

9/9/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 9/6/19 PARTY SERVED: EDUCATORS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2019083696

8/26/2019: PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2019083696

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT WITH ATTACHMENTS ISSUED

8/23/2019: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT WITH ATTACHMENTS ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS

2/14/2018: AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS

AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES

2/14/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

2/14/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT, AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO COMPLETE THE FACT INFORMATION SHEET

2/14/2018: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT, AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO COMPLETE THE FACT INFORMATION SHEET

SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 10/26/17 PARTY SERVED: AUSTIN JONES

11/8/2017: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 10/26/17 PARTY SERVED: AUSTIN JONES

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017099158

10/16/2017: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017099158

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

10/13/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/12/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/12/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF REMITTING FUND'S TO GARNISHEE'S ATTORNEUY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VOLUNTARY NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AND DISSOLUTION OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER OF GARNISHEE AND DEMAND FOR GARNISHMENT ATTORNEY FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 9/6/19 PARTY SERVED: EDUCATORS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2019083696

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT WITH ATTACHMENTS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketEntry: PROOF OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ENTERED 2/15/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT, AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO COMPLETE THE FACT INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 10/26/17 PARTY SERVED: AUSTIN JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017099158

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 10/13/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 CC 002496 CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less