This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 03/06/2022 at 17:32:26 (UTC).

NAEEM SAMAD AS TRTT OF SAMAD FAMILY TRUST II vs. RODRIGUEZ, JULIO

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 NAEEM SAMAD AS TRTT OF SAMAD FAMILY TRUST II filed an Other lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ, JULIO. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 OT

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NAEEM SAMAD AS TRTT OF SAMAD FAMILY TRUST II

Defendants

RODRIGUEZ, JULIO

PEREZ ORTIZ, YAHAIRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAYES, ROBERT S.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF TAKING DEPOSITION (IN AID OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (IN AID OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT OF INSOLVENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT OF INSOLVENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketEntry: GENERAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2021104545; Applied Amount: $320.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #2021104545

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketEntry: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 11/18/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CC 004010 OT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAYES, ROBERT S.