Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/14/2020 at 21:49:51 (UTC).

MORALES, LORI A vs. GANNETT, RAFAEL

Case Summary

On 01/30/2017 MORALES, LORI A filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against GANNETT, RAFAEL. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EPPERSON, HAL C JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 EV

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Osceola County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EPPERSON, HAL C JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORALES, LORI A

Defendant

GANNETT, RAFAEL

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S REGISTRY CHECK MAILED

4/27/2017: CLERK'S REGISTRY CHECK MAILED

CHECK REQUEST (EMAILED TO ACCT)

3/31/2017: CHECK REQUEST (EMAILED TO ACCT)

MOTION TO RELEASE FUNDS FROM REGISTRY OF COURT (FTJ)

3/22/2017: MOTION TO RELEASE FUNDS FROM REGISTRY OF COURT (FTJ)

EXHIBITS FOR IDENTIFICATION/ EVIDENCE LOG

3/21/2017: EXHIBITS FOR IDENTIFICATION/ EVIDENCE LOG

PAYMENT $11.45 RECEIPT #2017029501

3/21/2017: PAYMENT $11.45 RECEIPT #2017029501

PAYMENT $1.00 RECEIPT #2017016774

2/16/2017: PAYMENT $1.00 RECEIPT #2017016774

PAYMENT $0.90 RECEIPT #2017015316

2/13/2017: PAYMENT $0.90 RECEIPT #2017015316

PAYMENT $1,479.25 RECEIPT #2017014977

2/10/2017: PAYMENT $1,479.25 RECEIPT #2017014977

PAYMENT $1.00 RECEIPT #2017014399

2/9/2017: PAYMENT $1.00 RECEIPT #2017014399

SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED, DATE SERVED: 2/1/17 PERSON SERVED: RAFAEL GANNETT

2/3/2017: SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED, DATE SERVED: 2/1/17 PERSON SERVED: RAFAEL GANNETT

ANSWER BY RAFAEL GENNETT

2/2/2017: ANSWER BY RAFAEL GENNETT

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

1/30/2017: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2017010083

1/30/2017: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2017010083

SUMMONS ISSUED GIVEN TO THE PLAINTIFFS

1/30/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED GIVEN TO THE PLAINTIFFS

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/30/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/30/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR THE DEFENDANT (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CLERK'S REGISTRY CHECK MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CHECK REQUEST (EMAILED TO ACCT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketEntry: ORDER TO RELEASE FUNDS FROM REGISTRY OF THE COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR THE DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO RELEASE FUNDS FROM REGISTRY OF COURT (FTJ)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • HearingEvent: NON JURY TRIAL; Judge: EPPERSON, HAL C JR; Location: COURTROOM 5B; Result: HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: EXHIBITS FOR IDENTIFICATION/ EVIDENCE LOG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $11.45 RECEIPT #2017029501

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED, DATE SERVED: 2/1/17 PERSON SERVED: RAFAEL GANNETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER BY RAFAEL GENNETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT (7 DAY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketEntry: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2017010083

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED GIVEN TO THE PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/30/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 CC 000238 EV

    Read MoreRead Less