This case was last updated from Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court on 04/10/2022 at 17:17:02 (UTC).

MONTOYA, DARYON vs. HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/09/2022 MONTOYA, DARYON filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EGAN, ROBERT J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 PL

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EGAN, ROBERT J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MONTOYA, DARYON

Defendant

HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGH, NATALIA

Defendant Attorney

MITCHELL, CHARLES P

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT AND WRITTEN DISCOVERY REQUESTS

2/8/2022: COMPLAINT AND WRITTEN DISCOVERY REQUESTS

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketEntry: HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA'S ANSWER AND DEFENSES TO PLAINITFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENTS ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2022012912; Applied Amount: $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022012912

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 02/09/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CA 000331 PL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketEntry: GENERAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT AND WRITTEN DISCOVERY REQUESTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MITCHELL, CHARLES PENDLETON