This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/31/2020 at 12:46:11 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs. SONERA, ADA

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SONERA, ADA. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 SP

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

SONERA, ADA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FITZPATRICK, MOLLY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

8/27/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR DEFENDANT

3/28/2019: CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR DEFENDANT

LIMITED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, OSCEOLA COUNTY

3/22/2019: LIMITED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, OSCEOLA COUNTY

STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT

2/20/2019: STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT

LIMITED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, OSCEOLA COUNTY

2/13/2019: LIMITED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, OSCEOLA COUNTY

SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 2/2/19 PARTY SERVED: ADA SONERA

2/12/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 2/2/19 PARTY SERVED: ADA SONERA

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019001343

1/4/2019: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019001343

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

1/3/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/3/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/2/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/2/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

$ 2549.97 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

1/2/2019: $ 2549.97 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketEntry: ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISMISSING CAUSE - RECORDED (OR.5515.1867. / 2019054658)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS ATTORNEY PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION; Judge: SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE; Location: PRE-TRIAL/MEDIATION ROOM 1400; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: LIMITED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, OSCEOLA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS ATTORNEY PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION; Judge: SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE; Location: PRE-TRIAL/MEDIATION ROOM 1400; Result: RESET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketEntry: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketEntry: SMALL CLAIMS ATTORNEY PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION SET FOR 04/05/2019 AT 10:30 AM IN 1400 BEFORE JUDGE: SANDERS, GABRIELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: LIMITED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, OSCEOLA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 2/2/19 PARTY SERVED: ADA SONERA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019001343

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketEntry: SMALL CLAIMS ATTORNEY PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION SET FOR 03/01/2019 AT 9:30 AM IN 1400 BEFORE JUDGE: SANDERS, GABRIELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: $ 2549.97 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/02/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019 SC 000032 SP

    Read MoreRead Less