This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/31/2020 at 12:47:20 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs. RODRIGUEZ, LUIS

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ, LUIS. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 SP

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

RODRIGUEZ, LUIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FITZPATRICK, MOLLY

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT $3.00 RECEIPT #2020090533

11/18/2020: PAYMENT $3.00 RECEIPT #2020090533

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DISSOULTION OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

4/29/2020: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DISSOULTION OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

SECOND NOTICE TO DEFENDANT

3/23/2020: SECOND NOTICE TO DEFENDANT

ANSWER OF GARNISHEE

3/16/2020: ANSWER OF GARNISHEE

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT, RETURNED, SERVED

3/3/2020: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT, RETURNED, SERVED

FIRST NOTICE TO DEFENDANT

3/2/2020: FIRST NOTICE TO DEFENDANT

PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2020020689

2/26/2020: PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2020020689

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT WITH ATTACHMENTS ISSUED

2/20/2020: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT WITH ATTACHMENTS ISSUED

NOTICE OF IFLING OF DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

10/24/2019: NOTICE OF IFLING OF DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

PT MEDIATION HELD. AGREEMENT FOR FINAL JUDGMENT. ATTY TO SUBMIT JUDGMENT

3/29/2019: PT MEDIATION HELD. AGREEMENT FOR FINAL JUDGMENT. ATTY TO SUBMIT JUDGMENT

LIMITED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, OSCEOLA COUNTY

3/18/2019: LIMITED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, OSCEOLA COUNTY

LIMITED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, OSCEOLA COUNTY

2/13/2019: LIMITED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, OSCEOLA COUNTY

SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 01/11/19 PARTY SERVED: SUSAN RODRIGUEZ

1/22/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 01/11/19 PARTY SERVED: SUSAN RODRIGUEZ

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

1/3/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/3/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/2/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/2/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

$ 1878.32 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

1/2/2019: $ 1878.32 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $3.00 RECEIPT #2020090533

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketEntry: LETTER FROM ATTY REQ CERTIFIED COPY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DISSOULTION OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SECOND NOTICE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER OF GARNISHEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT, RETURNED, SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: FIRST NOTICE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2020020689

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT WITH ATTACHMENTS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketEntry: SMALL CLAIMS ATTORNEY PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION SET FOR 03/29/2019 AT 8:30 AM IN 1400 BEFORE JUDGE: SANDERS, GABRIELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 01/11/19 PARTY SERVED: SUSAN RODRIGUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2019001344

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketEntry: SMALL CLAIMS ATTORNEY PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION SET FOR 03/01/2019 AT 10:00 AM IN 1400 BEFORE JUDGE: SANDERS, GABRIELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: $ 1878.32 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/02/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019 SC 000033 SP

    Read MoreRead Less