This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 17:06:34 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs. LEE, TONYA

Case Summary

On 09/28/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LEE, TONYA. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EPPERSON, HAL C JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 SP

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EPPERSON, HAL C JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

LEE, TONYA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHATANI, PAYAL ESQ

 

Court Documents

SATISFACTION OF FINAL JUDGMENT (NO REC FEE)

4/5/2019: SATISFACTION OF FINAL JUDGMENT (NO REC FEE)

EXHIBIT'S LIST

12/13/2017: EXHIBIT'S LIST

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

12/8/2017: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT AS TO COURT COSTS

12/8/2017: AFFIDAVIT AS TO COURT COSTS

NOTICE OF FILING OF DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

12/8/2017: NOTICE OF FILING OF DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF INTRODUCING DOCUMENTS AT TRIAL AND WITNESS LIST

12/8/2017: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF INTRODUCING DOCUMENTS AT TRIAL AND WITNESS LIST

FILED IN OPEN COURT: NOTICE TO THE COURT OF NON AGREEMENT AND NOTICE OF NON JURY TRIAL

11/17/2017: FILED IN OPEN COURT: NOTICE TO THE COURT OF NON AGREEMENT AND NOTICE OF NON JURY TRIAL

LIMITED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, OSCEOLA COUNTY

11/14/2017: LIMITED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, OSCEOLA COUNTY

ANSWER FROM DEFENDANT TO COMPLAINT

10/24/2017: ANSWER FROM DEFENDANT TO COMPLAINT

SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED:10/10/17 PARTY SERVED: MATTHEW LAFRANCE

10/16/2017: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED:10/10/17 PARTY SERVED: MATTHEW LAFRANCE

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2017094374

9/29/2017: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2017094374

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

9/28/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

$ 2426.55 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

9/27/2017: $ 2426.55 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

9/27/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/27/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SATISFACTION OF FINAL JUDGMENT (NO REC FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • HearingEvent: NON JURY TRIAL; Judge: EPPERSON, HAL C JR; Location: COURTROOM 5B; Result: HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: EXHIBIT'S LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT AS TO COURT COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING OF DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF INTRODUCING DOCUMENTS AT TRIAL AND WITNESS LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER FROM DEFENDANT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED:10/10/17 PARTY SERVED: MATTHEW LAFRANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2017094374

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: SMALL CLAIMS ATTORNEY PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION SET FOR 11/17/2017 AT 9:30 AM IN 1400 BEFORE JUDGE: EPPERSON, HAL C JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/28/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 SC 004238 SP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: $ 2426.55 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less