This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/31/2020 at 12:47:44 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs. ACEVEDO, RICARDO

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed an Other lawsuit against ACEVEDO, RICARDO. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS, GABRIELLE and SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 CL

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Osceola County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS, GABRIELLE

SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

ACEVEDO, RICARDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEHMANN, COLLEEN E.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

6/21/2019: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR RICARDO ACEVEDO

4/29/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR RICARDO ACEVEDO

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019000759

1/3/2019: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019000759

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

1/2/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/2/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/2/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR RICARDO ACEVEDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019000759

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/02/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019 CC 000014 CL

    Read MoreRead Less