Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/14/2020 at 20:05:16 (UTC).

MASSEY, BINA vs. MASSEY, SINGH R

Case Summary

On 01/25/2017 MASSEY, BINA filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against MASSEY, SINGH R. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EPPERSON, HAL C JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 EV

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Osceola County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EPPERSON, HAL C JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MASSEY, BINA

Defendant

MASSEY, SINGH R

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT-RESIDENTAL EVICTION (FAILURE TO DEPOSIT RENT) (FTJ)

2/15/2017: MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT-RESIDENTAL EVICTION (FAILURE TO DEPOSIT RENT) (FTJ)

MOTION FOR DEFAULT/FAILURE TO DEPOSIT RENT

2/15/2017: MOTION FOR DEFAULT/FAILURE TO DEPOSIT RENT

ANSWER FROM PLAINTIFF

2/15/2017: ANSWER FROM PLAINTIFF

ANSWER FROM MATTHEW SINGH

2/10/2017: ANSWER FROM MATTHEW SINGH

SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 2/6/17 PARTY SERVED: MATTHEW SINGH

2/8/2017: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 2/6/17 PARTY SERVED: MATTHEW SINGH

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2017010207

1/30/2017: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2017010207

SUMMONS ISSUED (GIVEN TO PLAINTIFF)

1/30/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED (GIVEN TO PLAINTIFF)

PAYMENT $3.45 RECEIPT #2017010105

1/30/2017: PAYMENT $3.45 RECEIPT #2017010105

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

1/25/2017: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/25/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

1/25/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/25/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2017008748

1/25/2017: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2017008748

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • DocketEntry: ORDER DISMISSING CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT-RESIDENTAL EVICTION (FAILURE TO DEPOSIT RENT) (FTJ)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR DEFAULT/FAILURE TO DEPOSIT RENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER FROM PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER FROM MATTHEW SINGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 2/6/17 PARTY SERVED: MATTHEW SINGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2017010207

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (GIVEN TO PLAINTIFF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketEntry: AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION (3 DAY/ CT 1 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $3.45 RECEIPT #2017010105

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • DocketEntry: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION (3 DAY/ CT 1 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2017008748

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/25/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 CC 000182 EV

    Read MoreRead Less