This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 16:51:09 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC vs. PETERS, KEIVON

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PETERS, KEIVON. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EPPERSON, HAL C JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 SP

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EPPERSON, HAL C JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

PETERS, KEIVON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOORE, ASHLEY LENEE

 

Court Documents

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

3/28/2018: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

ALIAS SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR KEIVON PETERS

3/20/2018: ALIAS SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR KEIVON PETERS

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

3/7/2018: ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2018020946

2/28/2018: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2018020946

REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS

2/27/2018: REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR KEIVON PETERS

12/6/2017: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR KEIVON PETERS

PRE-TRIAL - NO PROOF OF SERVICE - FLOAT

11/3/2017: PRE-TRIAL - NO PROOF OF SERVICE - FLOAT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND AUTHORIZATION TO SETTLE FOR PLAINTIFF

11/1/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND AUTHORIZATION TO SETTLE FOR PLAINTIFF

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2017094155

9/28/2017: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2017094155

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

9/27/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

$793.79 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

9/27/2017: $793.79 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/27/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

9/27/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2018
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS ATTORNEY PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION; Judge: EPPERSON, HAL C JR; Location: COURTROOM 5B; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ALIAS SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR KEIVON PETERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: SMALL CLAIMS ATTORNEY PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION SET FOR 04/06/2018 AT 8:00 AM IN 5B BEFORE JUDGE: EPPERSON, HAL C JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2018020946

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR KEIVON PETERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS ATTORNEY PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION; Judge: EPPERSON, HAL C JR; Location: PRE-TRIAL/MEDIATION ROOM 1400; Result: NO PROOF OF SERVICE / FLOAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PRE-TRIAL - NO PROOF OF SERVICE - FLOAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND AUTHORIZATION TO SETTLE FOR PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2017094155

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketEntry: SMALL CLAIMS ATTORNEY PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION SET FOR 11/03/2017 AT 8:30 AM IN 1400 BEFORE JUDGE: EPPERSON, HAL C JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: $793.79 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/27/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 SC 004229 SP

    Read MoreRead Less