This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 01/26/2023 at 15:13:10 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC vs. ORTIZ, MARIA

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ORTIZ, MARIA. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 SP

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

ORTIZ, MARIA

Kissimmee, FL 34744-5004

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAPLAN, JOSHUA MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/12/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

$ 1,141.39 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

1/12/2023: $ 1,141.39 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/12/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

1/12/2023: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER (GENERAL TRACK)

1/12/2023: STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER (GENERAL TRACK)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/12/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

1/12/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2023005799

1/18/2023: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2023005799

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2023
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL; Judge: ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E; Location: COURTROOM 4E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2023005799; Applied Amount: $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2023005799

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL SET FOR 02/08/2023 AT 8:30 AM IN 4E BEFORE JUDGE: ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER (GENERAL TRACK)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: $ 1,141.39 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/12/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023 SC 000175 SP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less