This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 03/27/2023 at 17:04:33 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC vs. MARQUEZ, REYNALDO

Case Summary

On 01/26/2023 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARQUEZ, REYNALDO. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 SP

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

MARQUEZ, REYNALDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHERR, HAROLD E

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/26/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

$ 1,223.06 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

1/26/2023: $ 1,223.06 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/26/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR NAME AND EMAIL ADDRESS TO OPT INTO VIRTUAL MEDIATION PROGRAM

1/26/2023: REQUEST FOR NAME AND EMAIL ADDRESS TO OPT INTO VIRTUAL MEDIATION PROGRAM

STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER (STREAMLINED TRACK)

1/26/2023: STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER (STREAMLINED TRACK)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/30/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

1/30/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2023010247

1/31/2023: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2023010247

SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 2/10/2023 PARTY SERVED: REYNALDO MARQUEZ

2/10/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 2/10/2023 PARTY SERVED: REYNALDO MARQUEZ

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketEntry: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL; Judge: ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E; Location: COURTROOM 4E; Result: HEARING HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketEntry: ORDER FOLLOWING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 2/10/2023 PARTY SERVED: REYNALDO MARQUEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2023010247; Applied Amount: $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2023010247

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL SET FOR 03/10/2023 AT 10:30 AM IN 4E BEFORE JUDGE: ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketEntry: STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER (STREAMLINED TRACK) - STRICKEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR NAME AND EMAIL ADDRESS TO OPT INTO VIRTUAL MEDIATION PROGRAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketEntry: $ 1,223.06 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/26/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023 SC 000515 SP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less