This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 02/02/2023 at 22:12:32 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC vs. HISS, THOMAS J

Case Summary

On 01/05/2023 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed an Other lawsuit against HISS, THOMAS J. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 OT

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

HISS, THOMAS J

Palatka, FL 32177-7330

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAGUTSKY, JASON S

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

1/5/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

1/24/2023: ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2023006625; Applied Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2023006625

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketEntry: ALIAS SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2023001245; Applied Amount: $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketEntry: RECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketEntry: DOCKET HISTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketEntry: ORDER TRANSFERRING VENUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketEntry: NON-ENFORCEABLE RETURN OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023001245

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/05/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023 CC 000043 OT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less