This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 07/14/2023 at 06:32:12 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC vs. BRENDALEE, COTTO

Case Summary

On 01/26/2023 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BRENDALEE, COTTO. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 SP

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

BRENDALEE, COTTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHERR, HAROLD E

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/26/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

$ 2,529.32 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

1/26/2023: $ 2,529.32 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/26/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR NAME AND EMAIL ADDRESS TO OPT INTO VIRTUAL MEDIATION PROGRAM

1/26/2023: REQUEST FOR NAME AND EMAIL ADDRESS TO OPT INTO VIRTUAL MEDIATION PROGRAM

STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER (STREAMLINED TRACK)

1/26/2023: STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER (STREAMLINED TRACK)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/30/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

1/30/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023010251

1/31/2023: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023010251

SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 2/14/2023 PARTY SERVED: COTTO BRENDALEE

2/14/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 2/14/2023 PARTY SERVED: COTTO BRENDALEE

ORDER FOLLOWING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

3/10/2023: ORDER FOLLOWING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT

3/23/2023: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

3/23/2023: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT

3/23/2023: MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT

JUDICIAL DEFAULT

5/2/2023: JUDICIAL DEFAULT

FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED (OR.6400.1251. / 2023055608)

5/2/2023: FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED (OR.6400.1251. / 2023055608)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED (OR.6400.1251. / 2023055608)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: JUDICIAL DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL; Judge: ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E; Location: COURTROOM 4E; Result: HEARING HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER FOLLOWING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 2/14/2023 PARTY SERVED: COTTO BRENDALEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2023010251; Applied Amount: $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023010251

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL SET FOR 03/10/2023 AT 11:00 AM IN 4E BEFORE JUDGE: ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER (STREAMLINED TRACK) - STRICKEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR NAME AND EMAIL ADDRESS TO OPT INTO VIRTUAL MEDIATION PROGRAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: $ 2,529.32 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/26/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023 SC 000517 SP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less