*************7 SP
01/26/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Small Claim - Other Small Claim
Not Classified By Court
Osceola, Florida
ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E
LVNV FUNDING LLC
BRENDALEE, COTTO
SCHERR, HAROLD E
1/26/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET
1/26/2023: $ 2,529.32 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM
1/26/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
1/26/2023: REQUEST FOR NAME AND EMAIL ADDRESS TO OPT INTO VIRTUAL MEDIATION PROGRAM
1/26/2023: STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER (STREAMLINED TRACK)
1/30/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
1/30/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)
1/31/2023: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023010251
HearingEvent: PRETRIAL; Judge: ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E; Location: COURTROOM 4E
[-] Read LessFinancialReceipt Number: 2023010251; Applied Amount: $310.00
[-] Read LessDocketEntry: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023010251
[-] Read LessDocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)
[-] Read LessDocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
[-] Read LessDocketEntry: PRETRIAL SET FOR 03/10/2023 AT 11:00 AM IN 4E BEFORE JUDGE: ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E
[-] Read LessDocketEntry: STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER (STREAMLINED TRACK)
[-] Read LessDocketEntry: REQUEST FOR NAME AND EMAIL ADDRESS TO OPT INTO VIRTUAL MEDIATION PROGRAM
[-] Read LessDocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
[-] Read LessDocketEntry: $ 2,529.32 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM
[-] Read LessDocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET
[-] Read LessDocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/26/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023 SC 000517 SP
[-] Read Less