This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 10/21/2020 at 22:02:20 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC vs. ALEXIS, MOISE

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALEXIS, MOISE. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 SP

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

ALEXIS, MOISE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAGUTSKY, JASON S

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 10/10/20 PARTY SERVED: MOISE ALEXIS

10/15/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 10/10/20 PARTY SERVED: MOISE ALEXIS

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

9/25/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

9/25/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2020075001

9/25/2020: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2020075001

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

9/23/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

PROOF OF DEFENDANT'S ADDRESS

9/23/2020: PROOF OF DEFENDANT'S ADDRESS

$1133.69 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

9/23/2020: $1133.69 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/23/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 10/10/20 PARTY SERVED: MOISE ALEXIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2020075001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/24/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 SC 003816 SP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PROOF OF DEFENDANT'S ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: $1133.69 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less