This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 03/27/2023 at 17:04:23 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC vs. ALBIZU, LUZ V

Case Summary

On 01/26/2023 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALBIZU, LUZ V. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 SP

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

ALBIZU, LUZ V

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHERR, HAROLD E

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/26/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

$ 4,375.06 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

1/26/2023: $ 4,375.06 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/26/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR NAME AND EMAIL ADDRESS TO OPT INTO VIRTUAL MEDIATION PROGRAM

1/26/2023: REQUEST FOR NAME AND EMAIL ADDRESS TO OPT INTO VIRTUAL MEDIATION PROGRAM

STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER (STREAMLINED TRACK)

1/26/2023: STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER (STREAMLINED TRACK)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/30/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

1/30/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023010249

1/31/2023: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023010249

SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 02/13/23 PARTY SERVED:

2/13/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 02/13/23 PARTY SERVED:

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE AND REQUIREMENT TO ATTEND MEDIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL; Judge: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C; Location: COURTROOM 4B; Result: HEARING HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketEntry: ORDER FOLLOWING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 02/13/23 PARTY SERVED:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2023010249; Applied Amount: $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023010249

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL SET FOR 02/28/2023 AT 10:00 AM IN 4B BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketEntry: STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER (STREAMLINED TRACK)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR NAME AND EMAIL ADDRESS TO OPT INTO VIRTUAL MEDIATION PROGRAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketEntry: $ 4,375.06 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/26/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023 SC 000516 SP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less