This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 07/05/2021 at 17:05:22 (UTC).

LUCAS, NEENA vs CHISM, ALEXANDER

Case Summary

On 05/06/2021 LUCAS, NEENA filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against CHISM, ALEXANDER. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 PA

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LUCAS, NEENA

Respondent

CHISM, ALEXANDER

Not Yet Classified

A.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BENTON, JENNIFER PA

Respondent Attorney

BURNS, NICOLE M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER FOR ALEXANDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER TO AND COUNTER-PETITION TO ESTABLISH PATERNITY AND FOR RELATED RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2021042312; Applied Amount: $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021042312

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 05/06/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 DR 001726 PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: AMENDED ORDER IMPLEMENTING A STANDING TEMP ORDER FOR PATERNITY ACTIONS, ORANGE & OSCEOLA COUNTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER FOR NEENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (SHORT FORM) FOR NEENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: PETITION TO ESTABLISH PATERNITY, TIME-SHARING AGREEMENT AND FOR OTHER SUCH RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A.C. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JENNIFER BENTON