This case was last updated from Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County on 03/06/2022 at 14:29:51 (UTC).

LEBRON, LUIS WILLIAM vs. U HAUL CO OF ARIZONA

Case Summary

On 11/03/2021 LEBRON, LUIS WILLIAM filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against U HAUL CO OF ARIZONA. This case was filed in Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EGAN, ROBERT J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 AN

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EGAN, ROBERT J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEBRON, LUIS WILLIAM

Defendants

U HAUL CO OF ARIZONA

CARRILLO, JONATHAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HORST, ROBERT J

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

11/3/2021: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

11/9/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER (GENERAL TRACK)

11/3/2021: STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER (GENERAL TRACK)

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL

12/1/2021: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL

ROBERT J. HORST'S NOTICE OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSR LIEN (NOTICE)

12/6/2021: ROBERT J. HORST'S NOTICE OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSR LIEN (NOTICE)

PETER A. SHAPIRO, P.A.'S NOTICE OF ATTORNEYS' FEES LIEN ("NOTICE")

12/9/2021: PETER A. SHAPIRO, P.A.'S NOTICE OF ATTORNEYS' FEES LIEN ("NOTICE")

MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

12/22/2021: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW

1/27/2022: ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO WITHDRAW SET FOR 01/25/2022 AT 8:30 AM IN 5C BEFORE JUDGE: EGAN, ROBERT J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • HearingEvent: MOTION TO WITHDRAW; Judge: EGAN, ROBERT J; Location: COURTROOM 5C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketEntry: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • HearingEvent: MOTION TO WITHDRAW; Judge: EGAN, ROBERT J; Location: COURTROOM 5C; Result: NEITHER PARTY APPEARED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO WITHDRAW SET FOR 01/19/2022 AT 8:30 AM IN 5C BEFORE JUDGE: EGAN, ROBERT J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PETER A. SHAPIRO, P.A.'S NOTICE OF ATTORNEYS' FEES LIEN ("NOTICE")

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2021099628; Applied Amount: $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2021099628

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER (GENERAL TRACK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 11/03/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CA 002893 AN

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U-HAUL CO. OF ARIZONA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HORST, ROBERT J.