This case was last updated from Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County on 02/01/2021 at 22:19:09 (UTC).

LANDO RESORTS CORPORATION vs. MORRIS, RONNIE A

Case Summary

On 07/16/2015 LANDO RESORTS CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MORRIS, RONNIE A. This case was filed in Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is POLODNA, SCOTT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 MF

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

POLODNA, SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LANDO RESORTS CORPORATION

Defendants

HORTON JR, WALTER L

MCQUARRIE, RUSSELL

JACKSON, LISA R

MORRIS, WANDA

MERCADO, JACQUELINE

FOGLE, RONALD

MARTINEZ, DEBRA

MARTINEZ, PHILLIP

YOUNG, DAVID

VACATION VILLAGE AT PARKWAY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

MCQUARRIE, SHANNON A

DAVIS, TERESA V

CARRINGTON, DONNY

MORRIS, RONNIE A

DAVIS, MICHAEL

YOUNG, MARY

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENTS

7/19/2016: CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENTS

CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

7/19/2016: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

CERTIFICATE OF SALE ($100.00 PL)

7/5/2016: CERTIFICATE OF SALE ($100.00 PL)

SALE SHEET

7/5/2016: SALE SHEET

PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #2016073790

7/5/2016: PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #2016073790

NOTICE OF SALE PURSUANT TO CHAPTER 45, FLORIDA STATUTES

6/23/2016: NOTICE OF SALE PURSUANT TO CHAPTER 45, FLORIDA STATUTES

AFFIDAVIT OF LOST PROMISSORY NOTE

5/20/2016: AFFIDAVIT OF LOST PROMISSORY NOTE

AMENDED NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

5/20/2016: AMENDED NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

5/20/2016: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

5/20/2016: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

5/20/2016: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

5/20/2016: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

5/20/2016: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

5/20/2016: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

5/20/2016: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

5/20/2016: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

5/20/2016: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

5/20/2016: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2016
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE REC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • HearingEvent: MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SALE; Judge: FORECLOSURE SALES; Location: ROOM 2600 SUITE 2602

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF SALE ($100.00 PL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SALE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #2016073790

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • DocketEntry: PROOF OF PUBLICATION, FIRST PUBLICATION DATE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SALE PURSUANT TO CHAPTER 45, FLORIDA STATUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $1,187.50 RECEIPT #2015093354

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 07/17/2015 CASE NUMBER 2015 CA 001692 MF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VACATION VILLAGE AT PARKWAY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where LANDO RESORTS CORPORATION is a litigant