This case was last updated from Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County on 02/02/2021 at 00:02:34 (UTC).

LANDO RESORTS CORPORATION A FLORIDA CORPORATION vs. DURANT, IVETTE

Case Summary

On 07/20/2015 LANDO RESORTS CORPORATION A FLORIDA CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DURANT, IVETTE. This case was filed in Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WEISS, KEVIN B. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 MF

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WEISS, KEVIN B

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LANDO RESORTS CORPORATION A FLORIDA CORPORATION

Defendants

BALLINGER, JAMES H.

MCWHORTER, JENNIFER

VACATION VILLAGE AT PARKWAY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC.

GILBERT, KAREN L.

AQUINO, ONELIO F.

BALLINGER, JUDITH A.

DURANT, AUSTIN S

MCWHORTER, CHARLES E.

LARAMORE, RICHARD

AQUINO, BRIDGETTE C.

DURANT, IVETTE

CONTI, DANA

MARRERO VIERA, YAMIL

MARRERO, VICTOR A.

SIMMONS, WILLIE E.

WILEY, RICHARD K.

WEST, MIRILYN D.

MCKENZIE, MARILYN T.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

7/17/2015: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

7/17/2015: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

NOTICE OF SALE PURSUANT TO CHAPTER 45, FLORIDA STATUTES

2/2/2016: NOTICE OF SALE PURSUANT TO CHAPTER 45, FLORIDA STATUTES

PLAINTIFF MOTION FOR DEFAULT

10/1/2015: PLAINTIFF MOTION FOR DEFAULT

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

10/1/2015: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

10/1/2015: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

10/1/2015: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

10/1/2015: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

1/22/2016: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #2016025996

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • HearingEvent: MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SALE; Judge: FORECLOSURE SALES; Location: ROOM 2600 SUITE 2602

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF SALE ($100.00 PL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • DocketEntry: PROOF OF PUBLICATION, FIRST PUBLICATION DATE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SALE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SALE PURSUANT TO CHAPTER 45, FLORIDA STATUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $1,212.50 RECEIPT #2015094539

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 07/20/2015 CASE NUMBER 2015 CA 001723 MF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VACATION VILLAGE AT PARKWAY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where LANDO RESORTS CORPORATION is a litigant