This case was last updated from Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County on 02/02/2021 at 08:51:31 (UTC).

LANDO RESORTS CORPORATION A FLORIDA CORPORATION vs. CARDENAS, ROSA DELIA

Case Summary

On 08/04/2015 LANDO RESORTS CORPORATION A FLORIDA CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CARDENAS, ROSA DELIA. This case was filed in Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is POLODNA, SCOTT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 MF

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

POLODNA, SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LANDO RESORTS CORPORATION A FLORIDA CORPORATION

Defendants

COTTO, MICHAEL J

COTTO, TRICIA

FARJARDO, ALEXANDER

RILEY, WILLIE J

LEBLANC, KEITH P

FLOWERS, MARITZA

CARBEE, SCOTT S

BURNETT, BERTA M

MURPHY, PATRICIA

LEBLANC, DONNA C

AGIZA, DALILA

ADAMS, TERRIE L

BURNETT, DAREN J

BARBER, WILLIAM C

MURPHY, JERRY

CARBEE, BARBARA J

CORBIN, ALONDA L

POWELL, GERALD C

VACATION VILLAGE AT PARKWAY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC A FLORIDA NON PROFIT CORPORATION

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAPMAN, AMANDA

 

Court Documents

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

10/1/2015: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

CERTIFICATE OF TITLE (REC)

4/12/2016: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE (REC)

DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST DEFENDANTS

10/2/2015: DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST DEFENDANTS

CERTIFICATE OF SALE ($100.00 PL)

3/1/2016: CERTIFICATE OF SALE ($100.00 PL)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

8/4/2015: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

8/4/2015: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENTS

3/15/2016: CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENTS

SALE SHEET

3/1/2016: SALE SHEET

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

10/1/2015: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #2016026207

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • HearingEvent: MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SALE; Judge: FORECLOSURE SALES; Location: ROOM 2600 SUITE 2602

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF SALE ($100.00 PL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • DocketEntry: PROOF OF PUBLICATION, FIRST PUBLICATION DATE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SALE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SALE PURSUANT TO CHAPTER 45, FLORIDA STATUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $1,250.00 RECEIPT #2015101735

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 08/04/2015 CASE NUMBER 2015 CA 001892 MF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VACATION VILLAGE AT PARKWAY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where LANDO RESORTS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chapman, Amanda