This case was last updated from Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County on 12/18/2020 at 06:38:13 (UTC).

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC vs. STOFFEL II, RONALD ALAN

Case Summary

On 10/13/2017 LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against STOFFEL II, RONALD ALAN. This case was filed in Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MURPHY, MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 MF

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MURPHY, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RONAL ALAN STOFFEL II

SWEETWATER CREEK NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION I

STOFFEL II, RONALD ALAN

ISPC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NUBARYAN, KRISTINA

GIRARD, KRISTINA

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/13/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

ANSWER FROM THE DEFENDANT

11/3/2017: ANSWER FROM THE DEFENDANT

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

10/26/2017: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

5/8/2018: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS

5/8/2018: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS

NOTICE OF BORROWER NONPARTICIPATION WITH RMFM PROGRAM

12/8/2017: NOTICE OF BORROWER NONPARTICIPATION WITH RMFM PROGRAM

PLAINTIFF MOTION TO STAY CASE

12/8/2017: PLAINTIFF MOTION TO STAY CASE

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (REC)

10/30/2017: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (REC)

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RONALD ALAN STOFFEL II

10/26/2017: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RONALD ALAN STOFFEL II

SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 10/20/2017@450PM PARTY SERVED: UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

10/25/2017: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 10/20/2017@450PM PARTY SERVED: UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 10/23/2017@1205PM PARTY SERVED: INDEPENDENT SAVINGS PLAN COMPANY

10/25/2017: SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 10/23/2017@1205PM PARTY SERVED: INDEPENDENT SAVINGS PLAN COMPANY

SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 10/20/2017@1120AM PARTY SERVED: SWEETWATER CREEK NEIGHBORHOOD ASSN INC

10/25/2017: SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 10/20/2017@1120AM PARTY SERVED: SWEETWATER CREEK NEIGHBORHOOD ASSN INC

SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 10/20/2017@450PM PARTY SERVED: RONALD ALAN STOFFEL II

10/25/2017: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 10/20/2017@450PM PARTY SERVED: RONALD ALAN STOFFEL II

DEFENDANT COUNSEL DESIGNATION OF SERVICE EMAIL ADDRESS

10/24/2017: DEFENDANT COUNSEL DESIGNATION OF SERVICE EMAIL ADDRESS

ANSWER FROM THE INDEPENDENT SAVINGS PLAN COMPANY

10/24/2017: ANSWER FROM THE INDEPENDENT SAVINGS PLAN COMPANY

PROOF OF PAYMENT RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE MEDIAITION(RMFM) PROGRAM FEES

10/24/2017: PROOF OF PAYMENT RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE MEDIAITION(RMFM) PROGRAM FEES

PAYMENT $972.50 RECEIPT #2017099744

10/17/2017: PAYMENT $972.50 RECEIPT #2017099744

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

10/16/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF BORROWER NONPARTICIPATION WITH RMFM PROGRAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF MOTION TO STAY CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER FROM THE DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (REC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RONALD ALAN STOFFEL II

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 10/20/2017@450PM PARTY SERVED: UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: FORM A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF COMPLAINCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSURE MORTGAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SWEETWATER CREEK NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ISPC is a litigant

Latest cases where Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Girard, Kristina Nubaryan